This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2019 at 06:07:27 (UTC).

Jemal Hancock, et al v. Sotheby's Incorporated, et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Jemal Hancock filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Sotheby's Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1144

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

BENJAMIN DOLLER

SOTHEBY'S, formerly known as SOTHEBY'S HOLDINGS INCORPORATED

SOTHEBY'S INCORPORATED

Plaintiff / Appellants

LAVAN GALLERIES LLC

JEMAL LAVAN HANCOCK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Karim Basaria

Attorney at SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP

One S. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Kathleen L. Carlson

Attorney at SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP

One S. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

George Umunna Oparanozie

Attorney at OPTIONS LAW GROUP, P.C.

123 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

3 #4

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) ORDER: Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. [6979708] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC by 02/06/2019. (See order for further details) DW [2] [6979708] [19-1144] (VG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 04:04 PM]

#22

(#22) ORDER: A review of the Second Amended Statement filed by attorney George Umunna Oparanozie on March 10, 2019, reveals that attorney Oparanozie still does not have it righthe fails to identify all members of plaintiff Lavan Galleries LLC and each members state of citizenship. The court, therefore, orders attorney George Umunna Oparanozie to show cause for his failure to respond to the courts orders of February 27, 2019, and March 4, 2019. Attorney Oparanozie shall file his response on or before March 15, 2019. Counsel is advised that failure to respond may result in monetary or disciplinary sanctions. DW [22] [6989930] [19-1144] (VG) [Entered: 03/11/2019 12:28 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#4

(#4) Filed Certificate of Service to JURISDICTIONAL MEMORANDUM filed on 02/06/2019 by Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC. [4] [6982771] [19-1144] (Oparanozie, George) [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:29 PM]

#26

(#26) ORDER re: Attorney George U. Oparanozies Response to Rule to Show Cause, filed on March 15, 2019. IT IS ORDERED that the Rule to Show Cause, which issued on March 11, 2019, is DISCHARGED. DW [26] [6991478] [19-1144] (PS) [Entered: 03/18/2019 04:04 PM]

Open Document #1

Certified copy sent

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

25 #2

Mandate

#3

Exhibit B

#24

(#24) Filed Attorney Response by Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC Attorney GEORGE UMUNNA OPARANOZIE to RULE TO SHOW CAUSE. [24][6991169] [19-1144] (Oparanozie, George) [Entered: 03/15/2019 11:57 PM]

3 #2

Exhibit A

25 #1

Final Order with Mandate

#21

(#21) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC. [21] [6989805] [19-1144] (Oparanozie, George) [Entered: 03/10/2019 11:59 PM]

3 #1

Jurisdictional Memorandum

#23

(#23) Motion filed by Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC to dismiss case. [23] [6991160] [19-1144] (Oparanozie, George) [Entered: 03/15/2019 05:12 PM]

Open Document #2

Mandate

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER re: Attorney George U. Oparanozies Response to Rule to Show Cause, filed on March 15, 2019. IT IS ORDERED that the Rule to Show Cause, which issued on March 11, 2019, is DISCHARGED. DW [26] [6991478] [19-1144] (PS) [Entered: 03/18/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 03/18/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [6991296-2] [6991296] [19-1144] (FP) [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER: 1. Response to rule to show cause, filed on 3/15/19. 2. Agreed motion for voluntary dismissal, filed on 3/15/19. This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 23 ] [25][6991274] [19-1144] (FP) [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Filed Attorney Response by Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC Attorney GEORGE UMUNNA OPARANOZIE to RULE TO SHOW CAUSE. [24][6991169] [19-1144] (Oparanozie, George) [Entered: 03/15/2019 11:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Motion filed by Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC to dismiss case. [23] [6991160] [19-1144] (Oparanozie, George) [Entered: 03/15/2019 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER: A review of the Second Amended Statement filed by attorney George Umunna Oparanozie on March 10, 2019, reveals that attorney Oparanozie still does not have it righthe fails to identify all members of plaintiff Lavan Galleries LLC and each members state of citizenship. The court, therefore, orders attorney George Umunna Oparanozie to show cause for his failure to respond to the courts orders of February 27, 2019, and March 4, 2019. Attorney Oparanozie shall file his response on or before March 15, 2019. Counsel is advised that failure to respond may result in monetary or disciplinary sanctions. DW [22] [6989930] [19-1144] (VG) [Entered: 03/11/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC. [21] [6989805] [19-1144] (Oparanozie, George) [Entered: 03/10/2019 11:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending further court order. Counsel for the Appellant and Appellee are directed to make a telephonic or electronic mail status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 04/01/2019. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. RJS [6989134] [19-1144] (AP) [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • (#19) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Mr. Karim Basaria for Appellees Sotheby's Incorporated, Benjamin Doller and Sotheby's has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [19] [6988584] [19-1144] (LJ) [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER: The appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before March 11, 2019. (See order for details.) DW [18] [6988464] [19-1144] (CAG) [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: This appeal shall proceed to briefing. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 04/01/2019 for Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC. Appellees' brief due on or before 05/01/2019 for Benjamin Doller, Sotheby's and Sotheby's Incorporated. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/22/2019 for Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC. (See order for details.) DW [6985583] [19-1144] (CAG) [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed Response by Appellees Benjamin Doller, Sotheby's and Sotheby's Incorporated to Plaintiffs Appellants' Jurisdictional Memorandum. [9][6984616] [19-1144] (Carlson, Kathleen) [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Karim Basaria for Appellees Sotheby's, Sotheby's Incorporated and Benjamin Doller. [8] [6984597] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1144]--[Edited 02/14/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Basaria is added to the docket.] (Basaria, Karim) [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC are directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC by 02/27/2019. JR [7] [6984360] [19-1144] (MM) [Entered: 02/13/2019 05:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kathleen L. Carlson for Appellees Benjamin Doller, Sotheby's and Sotheby's Incorporated. [6] [6983947] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1144] (Carlson, Kathleen) [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER re: Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by appellants on February 6, 2019. Appellees shall file, on or before February 14, 2019, a response to appellants filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the court's order of January 23, 2019. DW [5] [6982888] [19-1144] (FP) [Entered: 02/07/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Certificate of Service to JURISDICTIONAL MEMORANDUM filed on 02/06/2019 by Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC. [4] [6982771] [19-1144] (Oparanozie, George) [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC. [3] [6982770] [19-1144] (Oparanozie, George) [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. [6979708] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC by 02/06/2019. (See order for further details) DW [2] [6979708] [19-1144] (VG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 02/05/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC by 01/25/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/04/2019 for Jemal Lavan Hancock and Lavan Galleries LLC. [1] [6979260] [19-1144] (AD) [Entered: 01/22/2019 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.