This case was last updated from PACER on 03/11/2019 at 06:18:20 (UTC).

Jelen v. Breezy Point Cooperative, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Jelen filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Breezy Point Cooperative, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-113

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan L. Jelen

Defendant / Appellee

Breezy Point Cooperative, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant

Sean E. Jelen

Ayer, MA 01432

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sean E. Jelen

Attorney at Federal Medical Center

P.O. Box 879

Ayer, MA 01432

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Sean E. Jelen, FILED. Service date 02/05/2019 by US mail.[2494556] [19-113] [Entered: 02/12/2019 09:31 AM]

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 01/25/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/15/2019, unless Appellant Sean E. Jelen, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis for case 19-113, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2482817] [19-113] [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:39 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER, dated 01/30/2019, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form for case 19-113, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2485718] [19-113] [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:13 PM]

#14

(#14) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Sean E. Jelen, FILED. Service date 02/05/2019 by US mail.[2494558] [19-113] [Entered: 02/12/2019 09:33 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#15

(#15) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Sean E. Jelen, FILED. Service date 02/05/2019 by US mail.[2494563] [19-113] [Entered: 02/12/2019 09:36 AM]

#8

(#8) ORDER, dated 01/24/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/14/2019, unless Appellant Sean E. Jelen, submits Form D-P for case 19-113, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2481942] [19-113] [Entered: 01/24/2019 04:32 PM]

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2473464] [19-113, 18-3194] [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:38 PM]

#7

(#7) NOTICE, to Appellee Breezy Point Cooperative, Inc. in 19-113, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, copy to pro se appellant, SENT.[2473471] [19-113, 18-3194] [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:42 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/21/2018, RECEIVED.[2473423] [19-113, 18-3194] [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:22 PM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Sean E. Jelen, FILED. Service date 02/05/2019 by US mail.[2494563] [19-113] [Entered: 02/12/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Sean E. Jelen, FILED. Service date 02/05/2019 by US mail.[2494558] [19-113] [Entered: 02/12/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Sean E. Jelen, FILED. Service date 02/05/2019 by US mail.[2494556] [19-113] [Entered: 02/12/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER, dated 01/30/2019, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form for case 19-113, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2485718] [19-113] [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, dated 01/25/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/15/2019, unless Appellant Sean E. Jelen, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis for case 19-113, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2482817] [19-113] [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER, dated 01/24/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/14/2019, unless Appellant Sean E. Jelen, submits Form D-P for case 19-113, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2481942] [19-113] [Entered: 01/24/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE, to Appellee Breezy Point Cooperative, Inc. in 19-113, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, copy to pro se appellant, SENT.[2473471] [19-113, 18-3194] [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2473464] [19-113, 18-3194] [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2473442] [19-113, 18-3194] [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • (#3) NOTE: See lead case, 18-3194, containing complete set of docket entries.[2473430] [19-113, 18-3194] [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/21/2018, RECEIVED.[2473423] [19-113, 18-3194] [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Sean E. Jelen in 19-113, 18-3194, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2473399] [19-113, 18-3194] [Entered: 01/11/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.