This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/09/2022 at 06:08:13 (UTC).

Jeffrey Walker v. Guzman, et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Jeffrey Walker filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Guzman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15868

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JEFFREY E. WALKER

San Francisco, CA 94103

Defendant / Appellees

GUZMAN, Officer #2427

OSHA, Officer

FIELDS, Officer

DEERING, Officer

TRACY, Officer

GOMEZ, Officer

HUERRERA, Sgt.

NG, Officer

TAYLOR, Officer

MALASPEINA, Sgt.

GOMEZ, Captain

KEVIN PAULSON, Chief

MIAAMOTO, Sheriff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jeffrey E. Walker

Attorney at SFCJ - SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY JAIL

425 7Th Street

San Francisco, CA 94103

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Jeffrey E. Walker motion for TRO/Iinjunction pending appeal. Deficiencies: None. Served on 06/18/2022. [12490104] (HH) [Entered: 07/10/2022 02:22 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed order (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN and DANIEL P. COLLINS): A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (en banc) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not appealable); Religious Tech. Ctr. v. Scott, 869 F.2d 1306 (9th Cir. 1989) (denial of temporary restraining order is appealable only if the denial is tantamount to the denial of a preliminary injunction). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [12492108] (AF) [Entered: 07/12/2022 02:41 PM]

#4

(#4) MANDATE ISSUED. (BGS, CMC and DPC) [12508246] (RL) [Entered: 08/03/2022 08:37 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MANDATE ISSUED. (BGS, CMC and DPC) [12508246] (RL) [Entered: 08/03/2022 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed order (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN and DANIEL P. COLLINS): A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (en banc) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not appealable); Religious Tech. Ctr. v. Scott, 869 F.2d 1306 (9th Cir. 1989) (denial of temporary restraining order is appealable only if the denial is tantamount to the denial of a preliminary injunction). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [12492108] (AF) [Entered: 07/12/2022 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Jeffrey E. Walker motion for TRO/Iinjunction pending appeal. Deficiencies: None. Served on 06/18/2022. [12490104] (HH) [Entered: 07/10/2022 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jeffrey E. Walker opening brief due 08/08/2022. [12468329] (ABT) [Entered: 06/10/2022 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OSHA is a litigant

Latest cases where Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean is a litigant

Latest cases where GOMEZ is a litigant

Latest cases where DR. NG is a litigant