This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:01:19 (UTC).

Jeffrey Lovitky v. Donald Trump

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Jeffrey Lovitky filed an Other lawsuit against Donald Trump. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5199

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jeffrey A. Lovitky

Washington, DC 20006-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mark B. Stern

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Matthew J. Glover

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jeffrey A. Lovitky

Attorney at Law Office of Jeffrey A. Lovitky

1776 K Street, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20006-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1801555] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:55 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1801554] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:53 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1801761] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 05:25 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1797538] filed by Matthew J. Glover and co-counsel Mark B. Stern on behalf of Appellee Donald J. Trump. [19-5199] (Glover, Matthew) [Entered: 07/16/2019 05:40 PM]

Open Document

JOINT APPENDIX [1803065] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 08/21/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:04 AM]

Open Document

APPELLANT BRIEF [1803181] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/21/2019 ] Length of Brief: 12,995 words. [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/21/2019 05:42 PM]

Open Document

CONSENT MOTION [1797992] to expedite case filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky (Service Date: 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 856 words. [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/19/2019 07:22 AM]

Open Document

LETTER [1800890] advising of arguing counsel's availability for oral argument filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/06/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/06/2019 12:15 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1797442] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01454-CKK filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5199. [19-5199] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:16 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1797444] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/30/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/30/2019, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5199] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:17 PM]

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1801551] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:48 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1802440] filed by Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 08/15/2019 ] [19-5199] (Glover, Matthew) [Entered: 08/15/2019 04:47 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1801549] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:47 AM]

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1801548] submitted by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:45 AM]

Open Document

LETTER [1797557] Notification pursuant to Rule 47.2(a) filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 07/16/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:28 PM]

Open Document #1

Order Sent

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT BRIEF [1803181] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/21/2019 ] Length of Brief: 12,995 words. [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/21/2019 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT APPENDIX [1803065] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 08/21/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1802440] filed by Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 08/15/2019 ] [19-5199] (Glover, Matthew) [Entered: 08/15/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1801761] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1801555] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1801554] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1801551] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1801549] filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1801548] submitted by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1800890] advising of arguing counsel's availability for oral argument filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 08/06/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/06/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1800648] filed granting appellant's consent motion for expedited briefing schedule [ # 1797992-2 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 08/22/2019. APPENDIX due 08/22/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 09/25/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/09/2019. [19-5199] [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSENT MOTION [1797992] to expedite case filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky (Service Date: 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 856 words. [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/19/2019 07:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1797557] Notification pursuant to Rule 47.2(a) filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky [Service Date: 07/16/2019 ] [19-5199] (Lovitky, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1797538] filed by Matthew J. Glover and co-counsel Mark B. Stern on behalf of Appellee Donald J. Trump. [19-5199] (Glover, Matthew) [Entered: 07/16/2019 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FIRST CLASS AND CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1797450] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.70190700000052691362] of order [ # 1797444-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 08/15/2019 from Jeffrey A. Lovitky. [19-5199] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1797444] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/30/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/30/2019, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5199] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1797442] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01454-CKK filed by Jeffrey A. Lovitky. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5199. [19-5199] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5199] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.