This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2019 at 06:09:22 (UTC).

Jeffery Moore v. Equitrans, L.P.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 Jeffery Moore filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Equitrans, L P. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1065

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

EQUITRANS, L.P., a Pennsylvania Limited Partnership

Plaintiff / Appellants

JEFFERY J. MOORE

SANDRA J. MOORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David K. Hendrickson Esq.

Attorney at HENDRICKSON & LONG, PLLC

214 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301

Barbara Allen Samples

Attorney at HENDRICKSON & LONG, PLLC

214 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Patrick Craig Timony

Attorney at BOWLES RICE, LLP

600 Quarrier Street

Charleston, WV 23501

Kenneth Eugene Webb Jr.

Attorney at BOWLES RICE, LLP

600 Quarrier Street

Charleston, WV 23501

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00123-FPS. [19-1065] CB [Entered: 01/15/2019 10:58 AM]

5 #2

Nature of Case

5 #3

Transcript Order Form

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kenneth E. Webb, Jr. for Jeffery J. Moore and Sandra J. Moore. [1000447507] [19-1065] Kenneth Webb [Entered: 01/29/2019 01:23 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00123-FPS. Case manager: CBennett. [19-1065] CB [Entered: 01/15/2019 10:40 AM]

#11

(#11) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1065] MRB [Entered: 01/31/2019 08:23 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patrick C. Timony for Jeffery J. Moore and Sandra J. Moore. [1000447518] [19-1065] Patrick Timony [Entered: 01/29/2019 01:32 PM]

10 #2

Transcript order

5 #1

Docketing statement (civil/agency)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jeffery J. Moore and Sandra J. Moore. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000447511] [19-1065] Kenneth Webb [Entered: 01/29/2019 01:25 PM]

#12

(#12) Mediation conference data modified. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1065] MRB [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:05 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David K. Hendrickson for Equitrans, L.P.. [1000447694] [19-1065] David Hendrickson [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:40 PM]

10 #1

Transcript order acknowledgment filed

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Barbara A. Samples for Equitrans, L.P.. [1000447761] [19-1065] David Hendrickson [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:22 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Equitrans, L.P.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000447698] [19-1065] David Hendrickson [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:42 PM]

#13

(#13) Mediation conference data modified. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1065] MRB [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:09 AM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Mediation conference data modified. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1065] MRB [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Mediation conference data modified. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1065] MRB [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1065] MRB [Entered: 01/31/2019 08:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Cindy L. Knecht. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Jury Instructions of 03/24/15 and 03/25/15; Opinion of Court of 03/24/15 and 03/25/15; Testimony of 03/24/15. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Jeffery J. Moore and Sandra J. Moore. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00123-FPS. Transcript due from Cindy L. Knecht, Official Court Reporter on 04/08/2019. [19-1065] CB [Entered: 01/30/2019 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Barbara A. Samples for Equitrans, L.P.. [1000447761] [19-1065] David Hendrickson [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Equitrans, L.P.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000447698] [19-1065] David Hendrickson [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David K. Hendrickson for Equitrans, L.P.. [1000447694] [19-1065] David Hendrickson [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patrick C. Timony for Jeffery J. Moore and Sandra J. Moore. [1000447518] [19-1065] Patrick Timony [Entered: 01/29/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Jeffery J. Moore and Sandra J. Moore. [19-1065] Kenneth Webb [Entered: 01/29/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jeffery J. Moore and Sandra J. Moore. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000447511] [19-1065] Kenneth Webb [Entered: 01/29/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kenneth E. Webb, Jr. for Jeffery J. Moore and Sandra J. Moore. [1000447507] [19-1065] Kenneth Webb [Entered: 01/29/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00123-FPS. [19-1065] CB [Entered: 01/15/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-00123-FPS. Case manager: CBennett. [19-1065] CB [Entered: 01/15/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.