This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/01/2022 at 08:07:44 (UTC).

Jeff Franke, et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co, et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Jeff Franke filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against Norfolk Southern Railway Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3848

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

JEFF FRANKE

STEVEN FRYE

GREG FISH

Defendant / Appellees

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, aka Norfolk Southern Corporation

BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN

INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS

NORFOLK SOUTHERN NORTHERN LINES, WHEELING AND LAKE ERIE GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT

DAVID RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

E. J. Leizerman

Attorney at E.J. Leizerman & Associates

P.O. Box 461

Sylvania, OH 43560

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John B. Lewis

Attorney at BakerHostetler

1900 E. Ninth Street, Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114-3485

Dustin M. Dow

Attorney at BakerHostetler

1900 E. Ninth Street, Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114-3485

Lauren Theresa Stuy

Attorney at BakerHostetler

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

D. James Petroff

4200 Regent Street, Suite 210

Columbus, OH 43219

Joshua McInerney

Attorney at Wentz, McInerney, Peifer & Petroff

3311 Bear Pointe Circle

Powell, OH 43065

Dimitre James Petroff

Attorney at Wentz, McInerney, Peifer & Petroff

3311 Bear Pointe Circle

Powell, OH 43065

George Henry Faulkner

Attorney at Faulkner, Hoffman & Phillips

20445 Emerald Parkway, Suite 210

Cleveland, OH 44135

Jonah Daniel Grabelsky

Attorney at Faulkner, Hoffman & Phillips

20445 Emerald Parkway, Suite 210

Cleveland, OH 44135

Joseph Daniel Mando

Attorney at Faulkner, Hoffman & Phillips

20445 Emerald Parkway, Suite 210

Cleveland, OH 44135

John T. McLandrich

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Cleveland, OH 44139

Frank H. Scialdone

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Cleveland, OH 44139

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Lauren T Stuy. Certificate of Service: 03/02/2022. [21-3848] (LTS) [Entered: 03/02/2022 03:45 PM]

#43

(#43) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellee's unopposed motion to extend time 30 days to file brief [ # 42 ] filed by Mr. John B. Lewis, resetting briefing schedule: appellee briefs now due 04/15/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 03/02/2022 11:58 AM]

#42

(#42) FIRST UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Mr. John B. Lewis for Norfolk Southern Railway Company to extend time 30 days to file brief. Certificate of Service: 03/02/2022. [21-3848]--[Edited to clarify 03/02/2022 by MTW] (JBL) [Entered: 03/02/2022 11:18 AM]

#41

(#41) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. E. J. Leizerman for Greg Fish, Jeff Franke and Steven Frye. Certificate of Service: 02/14/2022. Argument Request: requested. [21-3848] (EJL) [Entered: 02/14/2022 01:52 PM]

#40

(#40) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief [ # 39 ] filed by Mr. E. J. Leizerman, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 02/14/2022; appellee brief now due 03/16/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 02/09/2022 04:57 PM]

#39

(#39) MOTION filed by Mr. E. J. Leizerman for Greg Fish, Jeff Franke and Steven Frye to extend time until 02/14/2022 to file brief. Certificate of Service: 02/09/2022. [21-3848]--[Edited to clarify 02/09/2022 by MTW] (EJL) [Entered: 02/09/2022 04:13 PM]

#38

(#38) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellants' motion to extend time 60 days to file brief [ # 37 ] filed by Mr. E. J. Leizerman, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 02/11/2022; appellee brief now due 03/14/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 12/07/2021 10:08 AM]

#37

(#37) MOTION filed by Mr. E. J. Leizerman for Greg Fish, Jeff Franke and Steven Frye to extend time 60 days to file brief. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2021. [21-3848]--[Edited to clarify 12/06/2021 by MTW] (EJL) [Entered: 12/06/2021 09:18 AM]

#36

(#36) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/13/2021; appellee brief due 01/11/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 11/02/2021 04:22 PM]

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

RESTRICTED

#26

RESTRICTED

#25

RESTRICTED

#24

RESTRICTED

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Lauren T Stuy. Certificate of Service: 03/02/2022. [21-3848] (LTS) [Entered: 03/02/2022 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellee's unopposed motion to extend time 30 days to file brief [ # 42 ] filed by Mr. John B. Lewis, resetting briefing schedule: appellee briefs now due 04/15/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 03/02/2022 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) FIRST UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Mr. John B. Lewis for Norfolk Southern Railway Company to extend time 30 days to file brief. Certificate of Service: 03/02/2022. [21-3848]--[Edited to clarify 03/02/2022 by MTW] (JBL) [Entered: 03/02/2022 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. E. J. Leizerman for Greg Fish, Jeff Franke and Steven Frye. Certificate of Service: 02/14/2022. Argument Request: requested. [21-3848] (EJL) [Entered: 02/14/2022 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief [ # 39 ] filed by Mr. E. J. Leizerman, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 02/14/2022; appellee brief now due 03/16/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 02/09/2022 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION filed by Mr. E. J. Leizerman for Greg Fish, Jeff Franke and Steven Frye to extend time until 02/14/2022 to file brief. Certificate of Service: 02/09/2022. [21-3848]--[Edited to clarify 02/09/2022 by MTW] (EJL) [Entered: 02/09/2022 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellants' motion to extend time 60 days to file brief [ # 37 ] filed by Mr. E. J. Leizerman, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 02/11/2022; appellee brief now due 03/14/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 12/07/2021 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION filed by Mr. E. J. Leizerman for Greg Fish, Jeff Franke and Steven Frye to extend time 60 days to file brief. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2021. [21-3848]--[Edited to clarify 12/06/2021 by MTW] (EJL) [Entered: 12/06/2021 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/13/2021; appellee brief due 01/11/2022. (MTW) [Entered: 11/02/2021 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#35) Transcript, [20], has been filed in the District Court on 11/02/2021 ; Court Reporter: Ms. Susan Trischan ; Actual Number of Pages: 13 ; Actual Number of Volumes: 1 ; [21-3848] (ST) [Entered: 11/02/2021 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - COUNSEL TO REFILE AS NON-MODIFIABLE PDF***APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Greg Fish, Jeff Franke and Steven Frye by E.J. Leizerman. Certificate of Service: 10/05/2021. [21-3848]--[Edited 10/05/2021 by MTW] (EJL) [Entered: 10/05/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Dustin M. Dow. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2021. [21-3848] (DMD) [Entered: 09/24/2021 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. D. James Petroff for Appellees Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2021. [21-3848]--[Edited to clarify 09/24/2021 by MTW] (DJP) [Entered: 09/24/2021 08:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen by James Petroff. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2021. [21-3848] (DJP) [Entered: 09/24/2021 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John B. Lewis for Appellee Norfolk Southern Railway Company Certificate of Service: 09/23/2021. [21-3848] (JBL) [Entered: 09/23/2021 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Norfolk Southern Railway Company by John B. Lewis. Certificate of Service: 09/23/2021. [21-3848] (JBL) [Entered: 09/23/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/20/2021 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/23/2021 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 09/23/2021 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Maria Welker (MTW) [Entered: 09/22/2021 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Greg Fish, Jeff Franke and Steven Frye. Transcript needed: y. (MTW) [Entered: 09/22/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen is a litigant

Latest cases where NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where International Brotherhood of Teamsters is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren T. Stuy