This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2019 at 06:10:41 (UTC).

Jeanette Bey, et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services,, et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 Jeanette Bey filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Carrington Mortgage Services. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11588

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

JEANETTE GUILLERMO BEY

Atlanta, GA 30308

TEMPLE OF CONSCIOUSNESS BEY

Po Box 54251

Atlanta, GA 30308

Defendant / Appellees

CARRINGTON HOLDING COMPANY, LLC

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC, (as a collective)

BRUCE ROSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jeanette Guillermo Bey

Po Box 54251

Atlanta, GA 30308

Temple of Consciousness Bey

Po Box 54251

Atlanta, GA 30308

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Allison Giardina Rhadans

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ne Ste 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309

Dallas R. Ivey

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

3575 Piedmont Rd Ste 500

Atlanta, GA 30305

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

supplement to appendix volume 2

Open Document #2

supplemental brief

Open Document #1

Motion to supplement opening brief and appendix vol 2

Open Document #4

CORRECTED COS

Open Document #2

VOL 2

Open Document #1

VOL 1

Open Document #2

CORRECTED CIP AND COS

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Dallas R. Ivey for Appellees Carrington Holding Company, LLC, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Bruce Rose. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11588] (ECF: Dallas Ivey) [Entered: 05/22/2019 01:44 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dallas Robert Ivey for Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, et al [19-11588] (ECF: Dallas Ivey) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:39 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellants Jeanette Guillermo Bey and Temple of Consciousness Bey. [Entered: 05/13/2019 07:53 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellants Jeanette Guillermo Bey and Temple of Consciousness Bey. [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:14 AM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 04/24/2019 as to Appellants Jeanette Guillermo Bey and Temple of Consciousness Bey. [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:43 PM]

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to file a supplemental brief and a supplement to volume 2 of the appendix filed by Appellant Jeanette Guillermo Bey. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8805091-1] [Entered: 06/20/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix filed [3 VOLUMES - 2 copies] by Jeanette Guillermo Bey and Temple of Consciousness Bey. Service date: 05/28/2019 US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Ivey, Rhadans. [Entered: 06/03/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by Jeanette Guillermo Bey and Temple of Consciousness Bey. Service date: 05/22/2019 [19-11588] Attorney for Appellee: Ivey - US mail; Attorney for Appellee: Rhadans - US mail. [Entered: 05/24/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Dallas R. Ivey for Appellees Carrington Holding Company, LLC, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Bruce Rose. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11588] (ECF: Dallas Ivey) [Entered: 05/22/2019 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dallas Robert Ivey for Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, et al [19-11588] (ECF: Dallas Ivey) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellants Jeanette Guillermo Bey and Temple of Consciousness Bey. [Entered: 05/13/2019 07:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellants Jeanette Guillermo Bey and Temple of Consciousness Bey. [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 04/24/2019 as to Appellants Jeanette Guillermo Bey and Temple of Consciousness Bey. [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Jeanette Guillermo Bey and Temple of Consciousness Bey on 04/24/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/03/2019. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/08/2019 as to Appellants Jeanette Guillermo Bey and Temple of Consciousness Bey. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/22/2019 as to Appellee Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.