Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2020 at 06:13:33 (UTC).

Jeanette Aguilar v. Howard Grobstein

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 Jeanette Aguilar filed an Other lawsuit against Howard Grobstein. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1093

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

JEANETTE AGUILAR

Riverside, CA 92508

Debtor

In re: JEANETTE AGUILAR

Appellee

HOWARD B. GROBSTEIN, Chapter 7 Trustee, Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Jeanette Aguilar

9069 Mandarin Ln.

Riverside, CA 92508

Appellee Attorney

Daniel A. Lev Esquire

Attorney at SulmeyerKupetz, APC

333 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

6 #3

objection

6 #2

noa

6 #1

District Court Notice Sent

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Attorney Daniel A Lev, Esquire for Appellee Howard B. Grobstein's Objection to BAP jurisdiction; served on 05/13/2020 US mail - Appellant Aguilar; email - Attorney for Appellee: Lev. [20-1093] (DAL) [Entered: 05/13/2020 09:59 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed order (Clerk: sms); No later than Tuesday, May 26, 2020: a. Appellant must file with the BAP a written, legallysufficient response explaining how the order on appeal is final and immediately reviewable under 28 U.S.C. 158(a)(1); or b. Appellant must file with the BAP a motion for leave to appeal explaining why the BAP should hear this appeal at this time. ( see attached order) (VJ) [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:47 PM]

#3

(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER to appellant Jeanette Aguilar. Copies to all parties. Appellant Jeanette Aguilar's opening brief due 06/08/2020. (PI) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:57 PM]

2 #3

Bankruptcy Court Notice Form

#2

form(s) sent

2 #1

Opening Letter

#1

(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 04/17/2020, and copy of order. (PI) [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:59 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#7) CLOSED: Case closed: Election without judicial action; 05/15/2020 20-1093 Transferred by election. (PI) [Entered: 05/15/2020 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice sent 05/15/2020 to District Court transferring appeal per objection. (PI) [Entered: 05/15/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Attorney Daniel A Lev, Esquire for Appellee Howard B. Grobstein's Objection to BAP jurisdiction; served on 05/13/2020 US mail - Appellant Aguilar; email - Attorney for Appellee: Lev. [20-1093] (DAL) [Entered: 05/13/2020 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed order (Clerk: sms); No later than Tuesday, May 26, 2020: a. Appellant must file with the BAP a written, legallysufficient response explaining how the order on appeal is final and immediately reviewable under 28 U.S.C. 158(a)(1); or b. Appellant must file with the BAP a motion for leave to appeal explaining why the BAP should hear this appeal at this time. ( see attached order) (VJ) [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER to appellant Jeanette Aguilar. Copies to all parties. Appellant Jeanette Aguilar's opening brief due 06/08/2020. (PI) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: CC-20-1093. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (PI) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 04/17/2020, and copy of order. (PI) [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less