This case was last updated from PACER on 07/30/2019 at 06:00:28 (UTC).

Jean Francis v. Patrick Pizzella

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 Jean Francis filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Patrick Pizzella. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5162

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jean D. Francis

Clinton, MD 20735-4330

Defendant / Appellees

R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary of Labor

Patrick Pizzella, Acting Secretary of Labor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jean D. Francis

4602 Stecoah Drive

Clinton, MD 20735-4330

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Jason Todd Cohen Esquire

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1797859] filed considering notice of non-opposition [ # 1797784-2 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1795623-2 ]; APPELLANT docketing statement, certificate as to parties, statement of issues, underlying decision, deferred appendix statement, notice of appearance, transcript status report due 08/08/2019. APPELLANT, APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/08/2019. APPELLANT, APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/22/2019. appellant's failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution [19-5162] [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:19 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1797784] of Non-Opposition filed by R. Alexander Acosta [Service Date: 07/17/2019 ] [19-5162] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 07/17/2019 07:23 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1796062] filed by R. Alexander Acosta [Service Date: 07/08/2019 ] [19-5162] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:38 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1796050] filed by Jason T. Cohen and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee R. Alexander Acosta. [19-5162] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:21 AM]

Open Document

MOTION [1795623] to extend time to file initial submissions filed by Jean D. Francis (Service Date: 07/01/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 2 pages. [19-5162] [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:56 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1793032] received from Jean D. Francis [signed for on 06/10/2019] for order [1791460-2] sent to Appellant Jean D. Francis [19-5162] [Entered: 06/17/2019 10:11 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1791722] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record Appeal fees received [19-5162] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:57 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1791454] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/22/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/08/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/08/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/08/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/22/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5162] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:41 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1790664] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-00763-RMC filed by Jean D. Francis. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5162. [19-5162] [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:44 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1797859] filed considering notice of non-opposition [ # 1797784-2 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1795623-2 ]; APPELLANT docketing statement, certificate as to parties, statement of issues, underlying decision, deferred appendix statement, notice of appearance, transcript status report due 08/08/2019. APPELLANT, APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/08/2019. APPELLANT, APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/22/2019. appellant's failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution [19-5162] [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1797784] of Non-Opposition filed by R. Alexander Acosta [Service Date: 07/17/2019 ] [19-5162] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 07/17/2019 07:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1796062] filed by R. Alexander Acosta [Service Date: 07/08/2019 ] [19-5162] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1796050] filed by Jason T. Cohen and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee R. Alexander Acosta. [19-5162] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1795623] to extend time to file initial submissions filed by Jean D. Francis (Service Date: 07/01/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 2 pages. [19-5162] [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1793032] received from Jean D. Francis [signed for on 06/10/2019] for order [1791460-2] sent to Appellant Jean D. Francis [19-5162] [Entered: 06/17/2019 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1791722] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record Appeal fees received [19-5162] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1791460] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3380 0000 3149 6837] of order [ # 1791454-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/08/2019 from Jean D. Francis. [19-5162] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1791454] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/22/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/08/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/08/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/08/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/22/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5162] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1790664] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-00763-RMC filed by Jean D. Francis. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5162. [19-5162] [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5162] [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.