This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2019 at 06:03:29 (UTC).

Jawana Jackson v. Nanette Barnes

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Jawana Jackson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Nanette Barnes. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1489

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

Jawana Keshun Jackson

Waseca, MN 56093-0741

Respondent / Appellee

Warden Nanette Barnes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Jawana Keshun Jackson

Attorney at FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 1731

Waseca, MN 56093-0741

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Ann M. Bildtsen

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

600 U.S. Courthouse, 300 S. Fourth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415-0000

Ana H. Voss

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

600 U.S. Courthouse, 300 S. Fourth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Report and Recommendation 1/14/19, Order of Dismissal 2/21/19, Judgment 2/21/19, and Order denying IFP 3/7/19 [4764893] [19-1489]--[Edited 03/25/2019 by MMH] (MMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:56 AM]

Open Document #1

ProSe Docketing Letter

Open Document

MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Appellant Jawana Keshun Jackson w/service 03/25/2019. [4771391] [19-1489] (MMH) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:04 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court. Compliance is due by March 26, 2019. [4764896] [19-1489] (MMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:58 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4770113] [19-1489] (MMH) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:02 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Appellant Jawana Keshun Jackson w/service 03/25/2019. [4771391] [19-1489] (MMH) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4770113] [19-1489] (MMH) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court. Compliance is due by March 26, 2019. [4764896] [19-1489] (MMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Report and Recommendation 1/14/19, Order of Dismissal 2/21/19, Judgment 2/21/19, and Order denying IFP 3/7/19 [4764893] [19-1489]--[Edited 03/25/2019 by MMH] (MMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4764880] [19-1489] (MMH) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.