This case was last updated from PACER on 01/09/2021 at 06:36:53 (UTC).

Javier Garcia-Bengochea v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Javier Garcia-Bengochea filed an Other lawsuit against Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-14251

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAVIER GARCIA-BENGOCHEA

Defendant / Appellee

ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Bryan Scott Gowdy

Attorney at Creed & Gowdy

865 May St

Jacksonville, FL 32204-3310

Stephanie Anne Casey

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Cir Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Roberto Martinez

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Cir Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Zachary A. Lipshultz

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US, LLP

600 Brickell Ave Ste 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Rodney S. Margol

Attorney at Margol & Pennington, PA

320 N First St Ste 609

Jacksonville, FL 32250

Aziza F. Elayan-Martinez

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Cir Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sanford L. Bohrer

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

701 Brickell Ave Ste 3300

Miami, FL 33131

Scott Daniel Ponce

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

701 Brickell Ave Ste 3300

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Scott Daniel Ponce for Appellee Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14251] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 12/04/2020 04:58 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sanford L. Bohrer for Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. [20-14251] (ECF: Sanford Bohrer) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:56 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott Daniel Ponce for Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. [20-14251] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:54 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. No hearings. [Entered: 11/17/2020 01:00 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. No hearings. [20-14251] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:56 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14251] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:54 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. [20-14251] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:52 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bryan Scott Gowdy for Javier Garcia-Bengochea. [20-14251] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:52 AM]

Open Document #4

USDC Judgment, DE # 33

Open Document #3

USDC Order, DE # 32

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Scott Daniel Ponce for Appellee Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14251] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 12/04/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sanford L. Bohrer for Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. [20-14251] (ECF: Sanford Bohrer) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott Daniel Ponce for Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. [20-14251] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketOver the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Appellants brief due on 01/19/2021 as to Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Appendix due on 01/26/2021 as to Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. [Entered: 11/23/2020 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 11/23/2020 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. No hearings. [Entered: 11/17/2020 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. No hearings. [20-14251] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14251] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. [20-14251] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bryan Scott Gowdy for Javier Garcia-Bengochea. [20-14251] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea on 11/09/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/21/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/24/2020 as to Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/08/2020 as to Appellee Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. [Entered: 11/13/2020 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD., A foreign corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Daniel Ponce