This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2020 at 06:12:49 (UTC).

Javier Garcia-Bengochea v. Carnival Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Javier Garcia-Bengochea filed an Other lawsuit against Carnival Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-12960

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

CARNIVAL CORPORATION, a foreign corporation d.b.a. Carnival Cruise Lines

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAVIER GARCIA-BENGOCHEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

George J. Fowler III

Attorney at Jones Walker, LLP

400 Poydras St Fl 30

New Orleans, LA 70130-3245

Stuart H. Singer

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

401 E Las Olas Blvd Ste 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Luis Emilio Llamas

Attorney at Jones Walker, LLP

201 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33131

Meredith Lys Schultz

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

401 E Las Olas Blvd Ste 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Corey Patrick Gray

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

401 E Las Olas Blvd Ste 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Samuel J. Dubbin

Attorney at Dubbin & Kravetz, LLP

1200 Anastasia Ave Ste 300

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6364

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Zachary A. Lipshultz

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US, LLP

600 Brickell Ave Ste 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Bryan Scott Gowdy

Attorney at Creed & Gowdy

865 May St

Jacksonville, FL 32204-3310

Stephanie Anne Casey

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Cir Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Roberto Martinez

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Cir Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Rodney S. Margol

Attorney at Margol & Pennington, PA

320 N First St Ste 609

Jacksonville, FL 32250

Francisco R. Maderal

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Cir Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Aziza F. Elayan-Martinez

Attorney at Lipscomb & Partners, PLLC

25 Se 2Nd Ave Fl 8

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Evan Matthew Ezray for Appellee CCL. Motion is Unopposed [9191702-1] [20-12960] (ECF: Evan Ezray) [Entered: 09/18/2020 01:13 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Corey P. Gray for CARNIVAL CRUISE LINE [20-12960] (ECF: Corey Gray) [Entered: 09/16/2020 08:02 AM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/19/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 09/09/2020 11:32 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Ellen Rassie, Filer: Javier Garcia-Bengochea, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 09/08/2020, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 06/15/2020. [Entered: 09/08/2020 06:10 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Meredith Schultz for Appellee [20-12960] (ECF: Meredith Schultz) [Entered: 09/08/2020 12:49 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Evan Ezray for Appellee [20-12960] (ECF: Evan Ezray) [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:31 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stuart H. Singer for Appellee CCL. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12960] (ECF: Stuart Singer) [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:24 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George J. Fowler, III for CCL. [20-12960] (ECF: George Fowler) [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:06 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Luis Emilio Llamas for CCL. [20-12960] (ECF: Luis Llamas) [Entered: 09/02/2020 11:41 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stuart H. Singer for CCL. [20-12960] (ECF: Stuart Singer) [Entered: 08/20/2020 04:07 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. [20-12960] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:47 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12960] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 08/17/2020 02:02 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Javier Garcia-Bengochea, Court Reporter: Ellen Rassie, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 06/15/2020. [Entered: 08/17/2020 01:58 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Transcript(s) ordered. [20-12960] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:41 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bryan Scott Gowdy for Javier Garcia-Bengochea. [20-12960] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:35 PM]

Open Document #4

DC Judgment Doc 121

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketOver the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Appellants brief due on 11/16/2020 as to Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketORDER: The motion to withdraw Evan Matthew Ezray as counsel for the appellee is GRANTED. (AGW) [ # 9191702-2 ] [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Evan Matthew Ezray for Appellee CCL. Motion is Unopposed [9191702-1] [20-12960] (ECF: Evan Ezray) [Entered: 09/18/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Corey P. Gray for CARNIVAL CRUISE LINE [20-12960] (ECF: Corey Gray) [Entered: 09/16/2020 08:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/19/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 09/09/2020 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Ellen Rassie, Filer: Javier Garcia-Bengochea, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 09/08/2020, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 06/15/2020. [Entered: 09/08/2020 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Meredith Schultz for Appellee [20-12960] (ECF: Meredith Schultz) [Entered: 09/08/2020 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 09/06/2020 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Evan Ezray for Appellee [20-12960] (ECF: Evan Ezray) [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stuart H. Singer for Appellee CCL. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12960] (ECF: Stuart Singer) [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George J. Fowler, III for CCL. [20-12960] (ECF: George Fowler) [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Luis Emilio Llamas for CCL. [20-12960] (ECF: Luis Llamas) [Entered: 09/02/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stuart H. Singer for CCL. [20-12960] (ECF: Stuart Singer) [Entered: 08/20/2020 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. [20-12960] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12960] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 08/17/2020 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Javier Garcia-Bengochea, Court Reporter: Ellen Rassie, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 06/15/2020. [Entered: 08/17/2020 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Bryan Scott Gowdy for Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Transcript(s) ordered. [20-12960] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bryan Scott Gowdy for Javier Garcia-Bengochea. [20-12960] (ECF: Bryan Gowdy) [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea on 08/06/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2020 as to Appellant Javier Garcia-Bengochea. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/03/2020 as to Appellee Carnival Corporation [Entered: 08/10/2020 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Carnival PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aziza F Elayan-Martinez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary Andrew Lipshultz(Designation Retained)