This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:25 (UTC).

Javier Campos v. Lorie Davis, Director

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Javier Campos filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Lorie Davis, Director. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20503

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

JAVIER NOEL CAMPOS

Beaumont, TX 77705-0000

Respondent / Appellee

LORIE DAVIS, DIRECTOR, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTIONS DIVISION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Javier Noel Campos

Attorney at CID Stiles Prison

3060 Fm 3514

Beaumont, TX 77705-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Casey Leigh Jackson Solomon

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Javier Noel Campos for certificate of appealability [9137942-2]. Motion due deadline satisfied. [19-20503] (MRW) [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:19 PM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Javier Noel Campos [19-20503] (ABT) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:10 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9103107-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Motion due on 09/03/2019 for Appellant Javier Noel Campos. Brief in Support due on 09/03/2019 for Appellant Javier Noel Campos [19-20503] (ABT) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:40 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Javier Noel Campos in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9137942-2 ] Brief in Support deadline satisfied. [9137945-1] [19-20503] (MRW) [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:20 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Casey Leigh Jackson Solomon for Ms. Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20503] (Casey Leigh Jackson Solomon ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:22 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Javier Noel Campos in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9137942-2 ] Brief in Support deadline satisfied. [9137945-1] [19-20503] (MRW) [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Javier Noel Campos for certificate of appealability [9137942-2]. Motion due deadline satisfied. [19-20503] (MRW) [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20503] (CCR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Casey Leigh Jackson Solomon for Appellee Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in 19-20503 [19-20503] (CCR) [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Casey Leigh Jackson Solomon for Ms. Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20503] (Casey Leigh Jackson Solomon ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-2804. Electronic ROA due on 08/06/2019. [19-20503] (ABT) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9103107-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Motion due on 09/03/2019 for Appellant Javier Noel Campos. Brief in Support due on 09/03/2019 for Appellant Javier Noel Campos [19-20503] (ABT) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Javier Noel Campos [19-20503] (ABT) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.