This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/30/2022 at 06:14:01 (UTC).

Jason Payne v. Joseph Biden, Jr., et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 Jason Payne filed an Other lawsuit against Joseph Biden, Jr ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-5154

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jason Payne

Defendant / Appellees

Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President

Office of Personnel Management

Kiran Ahuja, Director, United States Office of Personnel Management

General Services Administration

Robin Carnahan, Administrator, General Services Administration

Office of Management and Budget

Shalanda Young, Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget

Safer Federal Workforce Task Force

Jeffrey Zients, Co-Chair, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force

United States Department of Defense

Lloyd J. Austin, III, Secretary, United States Department of Defense

United States Department of the Navy

Carlos Del Toro, Secretary, United States Department of the Navy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Reed D. Rubinstein

Attorney at America First Legal Foundation

300 Independence Avenue, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Casen Ross

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Charles Wylie Scarborough

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Daniel Winik

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE [1955733] to withdraw attorney Marleigh D. Dover filed by Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Lloyd J. Austin, III, DOD, Carlos Del Toro, DON, GSA, OMB, OPM, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Jeffrey Zients, Shalanda Young and Kiran Ahuja (Service Date: 07/20/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 164 words. [22-5154]--[Edited 07/21/2022 by LMF] (Dover, Marleigh) [Entered: 07/20/2022 12:16 PM]

Open Document

APPENDIX [1954149] filed by Jason Payne [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 07/08/2022 ] [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 07/08/2022 02:59 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT BRIEF [1954147] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 07/08/2022 ] Length of Brief: 6,578 words. [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 07/08/2022 02:56 PM]

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1951003] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/17/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 10:38 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1950998] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/17/2022 ] [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 10:30 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1950990] filed by Reed D. Rubinstein on behalf of Appellant Jason Payne. [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 10:11 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1950988] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/17/2022 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 10:08 AM]

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1950979] submitted by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/17/2022 ] [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:54 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1950977] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/17/2022 ] [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:46 AM]

Open Document

JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1950881] to govern future proceedings filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, DOD, DON, GSA, OMB, OPM, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients and Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/16/2022 ] Length Certification: 31 words. [22-5154] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 06/16/2022 01:38 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1949933] to certificate [ # 1949926-2 ] filed by Jason Payne. [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/09/2022 11:50 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1949926] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/09/2022 ] [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/09/2022 11:42 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1949719] filed by Jeffrey Zients, Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, DOD, DON, GSA, OMB, OPM, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and Shalanda Young [Service Date: 06/08/2022 ] [22-5154] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 06/08/2022 11:31 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1949351] filed by Casen B. Ross on behalf of Appellees Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, DOD, DON, GSA, OMB, OPM, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Shalanda Young and Jeffrey Zients. [22-5154] (Ross, Casen) [Entered: 06/06/2022 10:57 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1948646] filed by Daniel Winik and co-counsel Marleigh D. Dover and Charles W. Scarborough on behalf of Appellees Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, DOD, DON, GSA, OMB, OPM, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Shalanda Young and Jeffrey Zients. [22-5154] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 05/31/2022 05:32 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1948487] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/15/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/30/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/30/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/30/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/15/2022 [22-5154] [Entered: 05/31/2022 09:08 AM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE [1955733] to withdraw attorney Marleigh D. Dover filed by Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Lloyd J. Austin, III, DOD, Carlos Del Toro, DON, GSA, OMB, OPM, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Jeffrey Zients, Shalanda Young and Kiran Ahuja (Service Date: 07/20/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 164 words. [22-5154]--[Edited 07/21/2022 by LMF] (Dover, Marleigh) [Entered: 07/20/2022 12:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX [1954149] filed by Jason Payne [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 07/08/2022 ] [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 07/08/2022 02:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT BRIEF [1954147] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 07/08/2022 ] Length of Brief: 6,578 words. [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 07/08/2022 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1951077] filed considering motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1950881-2 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/08/2022. APPENDIX due 07/08/2022. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/22/2022. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 09/12/2022 [22-5154] [Entered: 06/17/2022 04:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1951003] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/17/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 10:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1950998] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/17/2022 ] [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 10:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1950990] filed by Reed D. Rubinstein on behalf of Appellant Jason Payne. [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 10:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1950988] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/17/2022 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 10:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1950979] submitted by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/17/2022 ] [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1950977] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/17/2022 ] [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1950881] to govern future proceedings filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, DOD, DON, GSA, OMB, OPM, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients and Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/16/2022 ] Length Certification: 31 words. [22-5154] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 06/16/2022 01:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1949933] to certificate [ # 1949926-2 ] filed by Jason Payne. [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/09/2022 11:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1949926] filed by Jason Payne [Service Date: 06/09/2022 ] [22-5154] (Rubinstein, Reed) [Entered: 06/09/2022 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1949719] filed by Jeffrey Zients, Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, DOD, DON, GSA, OMB, OPM, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and Shalanda Young [Service Date: 06/08/2022 ] [22-5154] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 06/08/2022 11:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1949351] filed by Casen B. Ross on behalf of Appellees Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, DOD, DON, GSA, OMB, OPM, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Shalanda Young and Jeffrey Zients. [22-5154] (Ross, Casen) [Entered: 06/06/2022 10:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1948646] filed by Daniel Winik and co-counsel Marleigh D. Dover and Charles W. Scarborough on behalf of Appellees Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, DOD, DON, GSA, OMB, OPM, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Shalanda Young and Jeffrey Zients. [22-5154] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 05/31/2022 05:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1948487] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/30/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/15/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/30/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/30/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/30/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/15/2022 [22-5154] [Entered: 05/31/2022 09:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1948485] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-03077-JEB filed by Jason Payne. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5154. [22-5154] [Entered: 05/31/2022 09:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5154] [Entered: 05/31/2022 09:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less