This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/21/2019 at 06:16:43 (UTC).

Jason Hyatt v. Scott Walker, et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 Jason Hyatt filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Scott Walker,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1977

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JASON J. HYATT

Waupun, WI 53963-0000

Defendant / Appellees

SCOTT WALKER

CATHY JESS

JIM SCHWOCHERT

MARK CLEMENTS

JON E. LITSCHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jason J. Hyatt

Attorney at WAUPUN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 351

Waupun, WI 53963-0000

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed Appellant Jason J. Hyatt declaration for motion for appointment of counsel.. [16] [7018438] [19-1977] (CAG) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Jason J. Hyatt for for the recruitment of counsel. [15] [7018437] [19-1977] (CAG) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Jason J. Hyatt for order restraining prison officials from denying any available access to law library while on or between court deadlines. [14] [7018436] [19-1977] (CAG) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Jason J. Hyatt to for enlargement of time constraints for submitting brief on appeal. [13] [7018435] [19-1977] (CAG) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER re: Plaintiff-Appellant's Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Permanent Injunction Against WCI Prison Officials. [ # 11 ] This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). Because the appellant has not paid the $27.26 initial partial filing fee, the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to the court's fee notice and order dated 05/22/2019. CMD [12] [7017966][19-1977] (MM) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Jason J. Hyatt for temporary restraining order and permanent injunction against WCI Prison Officials. [11] [7017920] [19-1977] (VG) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re: Plaintiff-appellant's motion for leave to file brief on appeal; motion for enlargement of time constraints; motion for the recruuitment of counsel; motion for waiver of payment of initial partial filing fee. This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). Because the appellant has not paid the $27.26 initial partial filing fee, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED only to the extent that appellant Jason J. Hyatt shall pay the $27.26 initial partial filing fee in the district court by July 29, 2019. To the extent that Hyatt seeks to waive the initial partial filing fee so that his appeal can proceed to briefing without paying the $27.26, he should file a motion that includes a recent prison trust fund statement. Any other relief requested in the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to the court's fee notice and order dated May 22, 2019. [ # 9 ] [ # 9 ] [ # 9 ] [10] [7014054] CMD [19-1977] (ER) [Entered: 06/27/2019 12:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Jason J. Hyatt for leave to file brief on appeal; motion for enlargement of time constraints; motion for the recruitment of counsel; motion for waiver of payment of initial partial filing fee. [9] [7013830] [19-1977] (PS) [Entered: 06/26/2019 04:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Jason J. Hyatt leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 06/13/2019. District Court has assessed a $27.26 initial partial filing fee. [8] [7011009] PLRA initial partial filing fee due by 07/15/2019. [19-1977] (DSL) [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Docket(#7) Filed notice from the District Court that a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending. [7] [7010437] [19-1977] (DSL) [Entered: 06/11/2019 10:35 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Jason J. Hyatt. [6] [7010388] [19-1977] (AD) [Entered: 06/11/2019 09:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Jason J. Hyatt. [5] [7010057] [19-1977] (AD) [Entered: 06/10/2019 11:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jason J. Hyatt. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7010056] [19-1977] (AD) [Entered: 06/10/2019 11:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [7006522] [19-1977] (AG) [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Wendy Monfils, Brian Foster, N. Kamphuis, G. Loomans, M. Hille, and T. Moon. [2] [7006519] [19-1977] (AG) [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jason J. Hyatt by 05/29/2019. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 06/21/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 06/05/2019. [1] [7006502] [19-1977] (AG) [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less