This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2022 at 11:26:48 (UTC).

Jason Gowen v. Lieutenant Winfield

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 Jason Gowen filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lieutenant Winfield. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-6380

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant

MAJOR ENOCHS, #9

Plaintiff / Appellant

JASON WAYNE GOWEN

Pocahontas, VA 24635-0518

Defendant / Appellees

LIEUTENANT GERALD WINFIELD, #23

SERGEANT PHYLLIS R. FOUCHE, #40

CORPORAL TODD TAYLOR, #88

OFFICER DAVID M. SCHNEBLAGGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jason Wayne Gowen

Attorney at POCAHONTAS STATE CORRECTIONAL CENTER

317 Old Mountain Road, P. O. Box 518

Pocahontas, VA 24635-0518

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Julian Friedman Harf

Attorney at GUYNN WADDELL CARROLL & LOCKABY, P.C.

415 South College Avenue

Salem, VA 24153-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:20-cv-00247-TTC-JCH. Case manager: MBeall. [1001141418] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:39 AM]

#2

(#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jason Wayne Gowen ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Jason Gowen. [1001141421] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:42 AM]

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jason Gowen. [1001141428] Informal Opening Brief due 05/02/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:45 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Julian F. Harf for Phyllis R. Fouche, David M. Schneblagger, Todd Taylor and Gerald Winfield. [1001148471] [22-6380] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:27 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Phyllis R. Fouche. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001148473] [22-6380] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:28 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gerald Winfield. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001148475] [22-6380] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:30 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David M. Schneblagger. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001148478] [22-6380] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:31 PM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Todd Taylor. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001148482] [22-6380] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:32 PM]

#10

(#10) Letter re: timeliness of filing for informal opening brief and PLRA documents by Jason Wayne Gowen . [1001157869] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 05/05/2022 03:08 PM]

#11

(#11) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jason Wayne Gowen. [1001160122] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 05/10/2022 03:10 PM]

#13

(#13) ORDER filed granting motion for leave to proceed PLRA [12]. Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Jason W. Gowen #1054680. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jason Gowen and Tikki Hicks, Warden, Attn: Accounting Office, 317 Old Mountain Road, Pocahontas, VA 24365. [1001160181] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 05/10/2022 03:44 PM]

15 #1

Informal response brief (pro se cases, no paper copies required)

15 #2

Additional Document

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Phyllis R. Fouche, David M. Schneblagger, Todd Taylor and Gerald Winfield. [1001166748] [22-6380] Julian Harf [Entered: 05/23/2022 05:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docket(#14) PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Jason Wayne Gowen. [1001163283] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 05/17/2022 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER filed granting motion for leave to proceed PLRA [12]. Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Jason W. Gowen #1054680. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jason Gowen and Tikki Hicks, Warden, Attn: Accounting Office, 317 Old Mountain Road, Pocahontas, VA 24365. [1001160181] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 05/10/2022 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#12) PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Jason Wayne Gowen. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [1001160170] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 05/10/2022 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jason Wayne Gowen. [1001160122] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 05/10/2022 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter re: timeliness of filing for informal opening brief and PLRA documents by Jason Wayne Gowen . [1001157869] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 05/05/2022 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Todd Taylor. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001148482] [22-6380] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David M. Schneblagger. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001148478] [22-6380] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gerald Winfield. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001148475] [22-6380] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Phyllis R. Fouche. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001148473] [22-6380] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Julian F. Harf for Phyllis R. Fouche, David M. Schneblagger, Todd Taylor and Gerald Winfield. [1001148471] [22-6380] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket(#4) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 7:20-cv-00247-TTC-JCH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001141442] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jason Gowen. [1001141428] Informal Opening Brief due 05/02/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jason Wayne Gowen ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Jason Gowen. [1001141421] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:20-cv-00247-TTC-JCH. Case manager: MBeall. [1001141418] [22-6380] MEB [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julian Friedman Harf