This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 06:05:29 (UTC).

JaRonda Washington v. Stewart, Zlimen & Jungers, Ltd

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 JaRonda Washington filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Stewart, Zlimen Jungers, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3128

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JaRonda Washington

Defendant / Appellee

Stewart, Zlimen & Jungers, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Darren Brayer Schwiebert

Attorney at DBS LAW, LLC

Suite 280N, 301 Fourth Avenue, S.

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brad D. Welp

Attorney at STEWART & ZLIMEN

2860 Patton Road

Roseville, MN 55113

Michael Printy Arthur

Attorney at STEWART & ZLIMEN

2860 Patton Road

Roseville, MN 55113

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant JaRonda Washington w/service 10/16/2019 [4842179] [19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 10/16/2019 10:39 AM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant JaRonda Washington - Joint Appendix - w/service 10/15/2019 [4841914] [19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 10/15/2019 03:07 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant JaRonda Washington. No Transcript[4841906] [19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 10/15/2019 03:04 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant JaRonda Washington - w/service 10/15/2019. [4841902] [19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 10/15/2019 03:01 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Nicole Smith in 19-3124, JaRonda Washington in 19-3128. w/service 11/21/2019 , Length: 8410 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Nicole Smith and JaRonda Washington due 11/27/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Stewart, Zlimen & Jungers, Ltd. due on 12/23/2019 [4854820] [19-3124, 19-3128] (LMT) [Entered: 11/22/2019 09:42 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Nicole Smith in 19-3124. [4854578] [19-3124, 19-3128] (LMT) [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:59 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Appellant Addendum

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Michael Printy Arthur for Appellee Stewart, Zlimen & Jungers, Ltd. w/service 10/03/2019 [4837477] [19-3128] (MPA) [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:17 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Judgment 8/27/19, and Order granting IFP 9/30/19 [4837253] [19-3128] (MMH) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:17 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4837238] [19-3128] (MMH) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:59 PM]

Open Document

CORRECTED certificate of service for Corporate Disclosure, Doc No. [ # 4837481-2 ], disclosure for Calendar, Doc No. [ # 4837481-3 ], Appearance, Doc No. [ # 4837475-2 ], Appearance, Doc No. [ # 4837477-2 ], filed by Appellee Stewart, Zlimen & Jungers, Ltd. in 19-3124, 19-3128 [4837493] [19-3124, 19-3128] (MPA) [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:29 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Stewart, Zlimen & Jungers, Ltd. in 19-3124, 19-3128. - FOR CAL [4837481] [19-3124, 19-3128] (MPA) [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:20 AM]

Open Document

CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/12/2019. Appendix due 11/21/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Nicole Smith and JaRonda Washington due 11/21/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4837258] [19-3124, 19-3128] (MMH) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:23 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Nicole Smith in 19-3124, JaRonda Washington in 19-3128. w/service 11/21/2019 , Length: 8410 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Nicole Smith and JaRonda Washington due 11/27/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Stewart, Zlimen & Jungers, Ltd. due on 12/23/2019 [4854820] [19-3124, 19-3128] (LMT) [Entered: 11/22/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT brief of Nicole Smith in 19-3124, JaRonda Washington in 19-3128 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4854689] [19-3124, 19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Nicole Smith in 19-3124. [4854578] [19-3124, 19-3128] (LMT) [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Nicole Smith in 19-3124, Appellant JaRonda Washington in 19-3128 , w/service by USCA-8 on 11/21/2019 [4854570] [19-3124, 19-3128] (LMT) [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Nicole Smith in 19-3124, JaRonda Washington in 19-3128. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4854442] [19-3124, 19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 11/21/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT brief of Nicole Smith in 19-3124, JaRonda Washington in 19-3128 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4854439] [19-3124, 19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 11/21/2019 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant JaRonda Washington w/service 10/16/2019 [4842179] [19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 10/16/2019 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant JaRonda Washington - Joint Appendix - w/service 10/15/2019 [4841914] [19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 10/15/2019 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant JaRonda Washington. No Transcript[4841906] [19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 10/15/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant JaRonda Washington - w/service 10/15/2019. [4841902] [19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 10/15/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • APPEARANCE filed by Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant JaRonda Washington w/service 10/15/2019 [4841900] [19-3128] (DBS) [Entered: 10/15/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTED certificate of service for Corporate Disclosure, Doc No. [ # 4837481-2 ], disclosure for Calendar, Doc No. [ # 4837481-3 ], Appearance, Doc No. [ # 4837475-2 ], Appearance, Doc No. [ # 4837477-2 ], filed by Appellee Stewart, Zlimen & Jungers, Ltd. in 19-3124, 19-3128 [4837493] [19-3124, 19-3128] (MPA) [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Stewart, Zlimen & Jungers, Ltd. in 19-3124, 19-3128. - FOR CAL [4837481] [19-3124, 19-3128] (MPA) [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Michael Printy Arthur for Appellee Stewart, Zlimen & Jungers, Ltd. w/service 10/03/2019 [4837477] [19-3128] (MPA) [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/12/2019. Appendix due 11/21/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Nicole Smith and JaRonda Washington due 11/21/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4837258] [19-3124, 19-3128] (MMH) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Judgment 8/27/19, and Order granting IFP 9/30/19 [4837253] [19-3128] (MMH) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4837238] [19-3128] (MMH) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less