This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/15/2020 at 06:09:27 (UTC).

Jane Doe v. Trump Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 Jane Doe filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Trump Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1278

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Appellant

ACN Opportunity, LLC

Defendants

Ivanka Trump

Eric Trump

Donald J. Trump

Trump Corporation

Donald J. Trump, Jr.

Plaintiff / Appellees

Luke Loe, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Mary Moe, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Jane Doe, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Richard Roe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Stephanie Elizabeth Niehaus Esq.

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Benjamin J. Beaton Esq.

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

201 East 4Th Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Defendant Attorney

Joanna C. Hendon Esq.

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Raymond P. Tolentino Esq.

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

Roberta Kaplan

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

John Charles Quinn Esq.

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

Joshua Adam Matz

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

Alexander J. Rodney Esq.

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

Andrew G. Celli Jr.

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP

600 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10020

O. Andrew F. Wilson

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP

600 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10020

Louis William Fisher Esq.

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

Matthew J. Craig Esq.

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

 

Court Documents

#80

#25

#24

#120

#119

#114

#108

#96

#95

#93

#88

#84

#83

#81

#79

#78

#75

#65

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 69 ], on behalf of Appellant Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump in 20-1228, FILED. Service date 06/12/2020 by CM/ECF.[2861296][89] [20-1228, 20-1278] [Entered: 06/12/2020 06:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file under seal their unredacted opposition[ # 68 ] filed by Appellee Richard Roe, Jane Doe, Luke Loe and Mary Moe, by PWH, FILED. [2860626][88] [20-1228, 20-1278] [Entered: 06/12/2020 11:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to stay [ # 58 ], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe and Richard Roe in 20-1278, 20-1228, FILED. Service date 06/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2860185] [20-1278, 20-1228] [Entered: 06/11/2020 08:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#83) ATTORNEY, Andrew L. Kincaid for Appellant Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, TERMINATED.[2858562] [20-1228, 20-1278] [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#82) ATTORNEY, Cynthia Chen, for Appellant Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, TERMINATED.[2858559] [20-1228, 20-1278] [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#81) ATTORNEY, Tiffany Bates for Ivanka Trump Donald J. Trump Trump Corporation Eric Trump Donald J. Trump Jr., in case 20-1228 , [ # 79 ], ADDED.[2858554] [20-1228, 20-1278] [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) LETTER, dated 06/10/2020 on behalf of -- Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, regarding Attorney Andrew L. Kincaid , RECEIVED. Service date 06/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2858215] [20-1278]--[Edited 06/10/2020 by BM] [Entered: 06/10/2020 09:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump in 20-1228, FILED. Service date 06/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858191] [20-1228, 20-1278] [Entered: 06/10/2020 09:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docket(#76) SEALED OPPOSITION TO MOTION to stay [ # 36 ], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe and Richard Roe, FILED. Service date 06/05/2020 by email. [2857171][76] [20-1228, 20-1278] [Entered: 06/09/2020 08:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) OPPOSITION (Redacted) TO MOTION to stay [ # 36 ] on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe and Richard Roe in 20-1228, FILED. Service date 06/05/2020 by email. [2855920][69] [20-1228, 20-1278] [Entered: 06/08/2020 08:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe and Richard Roe, FILED. Service date 04/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2823484] [20-1278] [Entered: 04/21/2020 02:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe and Richard Roe, FILED. Service date 04/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2823481] [20-1278] [Entered: 04/21/2020 02:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe and Richard Roe, FILED. Service date 04/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2823477] [20-1278] [Entered: 04/21/2020 02:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe and Richard Roe, FILED. Service date 04/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2823474] [20-1278] [Entered: 04/21/2020 02:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, Luke Loe, Mary Moe and Richard Roe, FILED. Service date 04/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2823469] [20-1278] [Entered: 04/21/2020 02:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant ACN Opportunity, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/20/2020 by CM/ECF.[2822472] [20-1278] [Entered: 04/20/2020 03:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant ACN Opportunity, LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-19470446, FILED.[2821881] [20-1278] [Entered: 04/19/2020 08:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2821878] [20-1278] [Entered: 04/19/2020 07:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/09/2020, RECEIVED.[2821877] [20-1278] [Entered: 04/19/2020 07:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant ACN Opportunity, LLC in 20-1278, FILED. [2821629] [20-1278, 20-1228] [Entered: 04/17/2020 04:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less