This case was last updated from PACER on 04/01/2019 at 06:06:19 (UTC).

Jamie Pendleton v. City of Spokane Police Departm, et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 Jamie Pendleton filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against City of Spokane Police Departm. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35081

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

LAWRENCE HENRY HASKELL, Prosecutor

CITY OF SPOKANE POLICE DEPARTMENT

CITY OF SPOKANE, a municipal corporation

MICHAEL ROBERGE, Civil Enforcement Unit Officer

SPOKANE COUNTY PROSECUTERS OFFICE

BRENDA NELSON, Legal Secretary

JACOB KUHN, Legal Secretary Spokane County Prosecutor's Office

STACEY CARR, Civil Enforcement Detective

SPOKANE COUNTY

CASEY EVANS, Deputy Prosecutor

CITY OF SPOKANE PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAMIE C. PENDLETON

Spokane, WA 99260-0320

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jamie C. Pendleton

Attorney at Spokane County Detention Services

1100 W. Mallon Avenue

Spokane, WA 99260-0320

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Jamie C. Pendleton's opening brief (Informal: Yes) 17 pages. Served on 02/12/2019. Major deficiencies: motion to proceed in forma pauperis, motion to for appointment of consel pending. [11207694] (GV) [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:38 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed Appellant Jamie C. Pendleton letter dated 02/12/2019 re: request for copy of docket sheet. Paper filing deficiency: None. (Sent Appellant copy of docket sheet) [11201610] (QDL) [Entered: 02/20/2019 03:17 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed Appellant Jamie C. Pendleton statement that appeal should go forward. Served on 02/12/2019. [11201606] (QDL) [Entered: 02/20/2019 03:16 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Jamie C. Pendleton motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/05/2019. [11187577] (QDL) [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:07 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Jamie C. Pendleton motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/07/2019. [11185958] (QDL) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:15 PM]

2 #4

Additional Document

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Additional Document

2 #1

Main Document

1 #2

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Jamie C. Pendleton's opening brief (Informal: Yes) 17 pages. Served on 02/12/2019. Major deficiencies: motion to proceed in forma pauperis, motion to for appointment of consel pending. [11207694] (GV) [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed Appellant Jamie C. Pendleton letter dated 02/12/2019 re: request for copy of docket sheet. Paper filing deficiency: None. (Sent Appellant copy of docket sheet) [11201610] (QDL) [Entered: 02/20/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed Appellant Jamie C. Pendleton statement that appeal should go forward. Served on 02/12/2019. [11201606] (QDL) [Entered: 02/20/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Appellant Jamie C. Pendleton motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/05/2019. [11187577] (QDL) [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed Appellant Jamie C. Pendleton motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/07/2019. [11185958] (QDL) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has certified that this appeal is not taken in good faith and has revoked appellants in forma pauperis status. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If the court dismisses the appeal as frivolous, this appeal may be counted as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [11178480] (CKP) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO COUNSEL FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jamie C. Pendleton opening brief due 04/01/2019.[11173988] (JPD) [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less