This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:10 (UTC).

Jamie Kirnon v. Superintendent Dallas SCI, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Jamie Kirnon filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Superintendent Dallas SCI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2619

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SUPERINTENDENT DALLAS SCI

ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA

DISTRICT ATTORNEY PHILADELPHIA

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAMIE KIRNON

Dallas, PA 18612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Douglas M. Weck Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Philadelphia County Office of District Attorney

3 South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Molly S. Lorber Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Max C. Kaufman Esq.

Attorney at Philadelphia County Office of District Attorney

3 South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Ronald Eisenberg Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jamie Kirnon

Attorney at Dallas SCI

1000 Follies Road

Dallas, PA 18612

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Max C. Kaufman on behalf of Appellee(s) Supt. Dallas SCI; District Attorney Philadelphia; Attorney General Pennsylvania. [19-2619] (MCK) [Entered: 09/11/2019 08:51 AM]

Open Document

LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (SH) [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:12 PM]

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Douglas M. Weck, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Supt. Dallas SCI; District Attorney Philadelphia; Attorney General Pennsylvania. [19-2619] (DMW) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:19 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Jamie Kirnon for Certificate of Appealability. Response due on 08/22/2019. Certificate of Service dated 08/09/2019. Service made by US mail. (MB) [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:27 PM]

Open Document #4

Standing Order

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Jamie Kirnon, filed. (MB) [Entered: 09/03/2019 10:35 AM]

Open Document #3

Caption

Open Document #2

DC Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Max C. Kaufman on behalf of Appellee(s) Supt. Dallas SCI; District Attorney Philadelphia; Attorney General Pennsylvania. [19-2619] (MCK) [Entered: 09/11/2019 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Jamie Kirnon, filed. (MB) [Entered: 09/03/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Jamie Kirnon for Certificate of Appealability. Response due on 08/22/2019. Certificate of Service dated 08/09/2019. Service made by US mail. (MB) [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jamie Kirnon, filed. (ARR) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Jamie Kirnon to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019. Service made by US mail. (ARR) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Douglas M. Weck, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Supt. Dallas SCI; District Attorney Philadelphia; Attorney General Pennsylvania. [19-2619] (DMW) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (SH) [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jamie Kirnon in District Court No. 2-07-cv-004474. (MB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.