This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2020 at 06:17:49 (UTC).

James Whitfield v. U.S. Secretary of State

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 James Whitfield filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against U S Secretary of State. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-13071

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

U.S. SECRETARY OF STATE

SECRETARY OF STATE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner / Appellant

JAMES WHITFIELD

Atlanta, GA 30339

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

75 Ted Turner Dr Sw Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Y. Soo Jo

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

75 Ted Turner Dr Sw Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Jane Elizabeth McBath

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

75 Ted Turner Dr Sw Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

James Whitfield

2451 Cumberland Pkwy Ste 3235

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant James Whitfield. [20-13071] (ECF: James Whitfield) [Entered: 10/05/2020 04:23 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: The appellant's motion to reinstate the appeal is GRANTED. (JC) [ # 9205129-2 ] [ # 9205129-3 ] [Entered: 10/06/2020 08:41 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to reinstate appeal filed by James Whitfield. [9205129-1] [20-13071]--[Edited 10/06/2020 by JC] (ECF: James Whitfield) [Entered: 10/05/2020 04:53 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant James Whitfield failed to file an appendix within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 09/30/2020 08:32 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by James Whitfield. [20-13071] (ECF: James Whitfield) [Entered: 09/21/2020 12:00 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party James Whitfield. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13071] (ECF: James Whitfield) [Entered: 09/16/2020 02:36 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant James Whitfield. [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:24 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Elizabeth McBath for Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Secretary of State [20-13071] (ECF: Jane McBath) [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:12 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Y. Soo Jo for Appellee U.S. Secretary of State. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13071] (ECF: Y. Jo) [Entered: 09/01/2020 11:24 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to James Whitfield. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of documents without action, or other sanctions. [Entered: 08/28/2020 08:46 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Y. Soo Jo for Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Secretary of State [20-13071] (ECF: Y. Jo) [Entered: 08/24/2020 05:44 PM]

Open Document #4

DC Judgment Appealed DE# 50

Open Document #3

DC Order Appealed DE# 49

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant James Whitfield. 1 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 10/09/2020 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant James Whitfield. [20-13071] (ECF: James Whitfield) [Entered: 10/05/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The appellant's motion to reinstate the appeal is GRANTED. (JC) [ # 9205129-2 ] [ # 9205129-3 ] [Entered: 10/06/2020 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to reinstate appeal filed by James Whitfield. [9205129-1] [20-13071]--[Edited 10/06/2020 by JC] (ECF: James Whitfield) [Entered: 10/05/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant James Whitfield failed to file an appendix within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 09/30/2020 08:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketERROR--[Edited 09/24/2020 by MLM]--[Edited 09/24/2020 by MLM] [Entered: 09/24/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant James Whitfield. [Entered: 09/23/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by James Whitfield. [20-13071] (ECF: James Whitfield) [Entered: 09/21/2020 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party James Whitfield. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13071] (ECF: James Whitfield) [Entered: 09/16/2020 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant James Whitfield. [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Elizabeth McBath for Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Secretary of State [20-13071] (ECF: Jane McBath) [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Y. Soo Jo for Appellee U.S. Secretary of State. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13071] (ECF: Y. Jo) [Entered: 09/01/2020 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to James Whitfield. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of documents without action, or other sanctions. [Entered: 08/28/2020 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Y. Soo Jo for Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Secretary of State [20-13071] (ECF: Y. Jo) [Entered: 08/24/2020 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant James Whitfield on 08/12/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/22/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/27/2020 as to Appellant James Whitfield. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/10/2020 as to Appellee U.S. Secretary of State [Entered: 08/18/2020 07:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. SECRETARY OF STATE is a litigant