This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2019 at 06:09:07 (UTC).

James Turner v. Reed Richardson

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 James Turner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Reed Richardson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1114

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

REED A. RICHARDSON

Petitioner / Appellant

JAMES R. TURNER

Stanley, WI 54768-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

James R. Turner

Attorney at STANLEY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

100 Corrections Drive

Stanley, WI 54768-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Mandate

Open Document #1

Certified copy sent

4 #1

Final Order with Mandate

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) ORDER: Appellant James R. Turner is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant James R. Turner by 02/27/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 0700. JR [2] [6984350] [19-1114] (MM) [Entered: 02/13/2019 05:29 PM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

State Habeas/Appealability Denied Case

4 #2

Mandate

#3

(#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant James R. Turner requesting the court of appeals to withdraw his appeal. [3] [6989254] [19-1114] (MM) [Entered: 03/07/2019 09:17 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 03/07/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [6989296-2] [6989296] [19-1114] (CAG) [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: re: Motion requesting the Court of Appeals to withdraw his appeal. This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 3 ][4][6989290] [19-1114] (CAG) [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant James R. Turner requesting the court of appeals to withdraw his appeal. [3] [6989254] [19-1114] (MM) [Entered: 03/07/2019 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: Appellant James R. Turner is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant James R. Turner by 02/27/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 0700. JR [2] [6984350] [19-1114] (MM) [Entered: 02/13/2019 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 12/20/2018. IFP. Docketing Statement due for Appellant James R. Turner by 01/22/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/30/2019. [1] [6978392] [19-1114] (VG) [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.