This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/01/2022 at 06:08:48 (UTC).

James Tanner v. Kurt Ziegenhorn, et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 James Tanner filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kurt Ziegenhorn. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3462

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendants

John Doe, 1-5, individually and in their official capacity

Mike Kennedy, Individually

Elizabeth Chapman, Individually

Plaintiff / Appellant

James Andrew Tanner

Defendant / Appellees

Kurt Ziegenhorn, in his individual capacity

Bill Bryant, Colonel, in his official capacity as head of the Arkansas State Police, an agency of the State of Arkansas

William Sadler, "Bill", in his individual capacity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William W. Hyman

Attorney at KING LAW GROUP

300 N. Sixth Street

Fort Smith, AR 72901

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Reid Phillip Adkins

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

200 Catlett-Prien Building, 323 Center Street

Little Rock, AR 72201-0000

William C. Bird III

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

200 Catlett-Prien Building, 323 Center Street

Little Rock, AR 72201-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [5093218] [21-3462] (AEV) [Entered: 11/02/2021 12:10 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 5/31/19, Order 9/22/20, Memorandum, Opinion and Order 9/3021, Judgment 9/30/21, docket entries, [5093223] [21-3462] (AEV) [Entered: 11/02/2021 12:14 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 12/13/2021. Appendix due 12/22/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, James Andrew Tanner due 12/22/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5093226] [21-3462] (AEV) [Entered: 11/02/2021 12:16 PM]

Open Document

LETTER regarding Appellant's counsel advises that no transcripts are necessary to prosecute his appeal., filed by Court Reporter Mr. Stephen W. Franklin, Ms. Christa Jacimore and Ms. Kathleen Maloney w/service 11/05/2021 [5094554] [21-3462] (SWF) [Entered: 11/05/2021 08:37 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER regarding Appellant's counsel advises that no transcripts are necessary to prosecute his appeal., filed by Court Reporter Mr. Stephen W. Franklin, Ms. Christa Jacimore and Ms. Kathleen Maloney w/service 11/05/2021 [5094554] [21-3462] (SWF) [Entered: 11/05/2021 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketUPDATED fee status - [Case Number 21-3462: paid - cs] [5093344] [21-3462] (AEV) [Entered: 11/02/2021 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 12/13/2021. Appendix due 12/22/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, James Andrew Tanner due 12/22/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5093226] [21-3462] (AEV) [Entered: 11/02/2021 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 5/31/19, Order 9/22/20, Memorandum, Opinion and Order 9/3021, Judgment 9/30/21, docket entries, [5093223] [21-3462] (AEV) [Entered: 11/02/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5093218] [21-3462] (AEV) [Entered: 11/02/2021 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer William C. Bird, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reid Phillip Adkins