This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2019 at 06:06:20 (UTC).

James Shelton v. Fast Advance Funding LLC

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 James Shelton filed an Other lawsuit against Fast Advance Funding LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2265

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

FAST ADVANCE FUNDING LLC

Plaintiff / Appellee

JAMES EVERETT SHELTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Cynthia A. Clark Esq.

Attorney at Bochetto & Lentz

1524 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

John P. Hartley Esq.

Attorney at Complete Business Solutions Group

20 North 3Rd Street

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Bryan Reo Esq.

P.O. Box 5100

Mentor, OH 44061

Clayton S. Morrow Esq.

Attorney at Morrow & Morrow

304 Ross Street, Suite 703

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Standing Order

Open Document #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

Open Restricted Document #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

Open Restricted Document #1

Mediation Instructions

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bryan Anthony Reo on behalf of Appellee(s) James Shelton. [19-2265] (BR) [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:43 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Fast Advance Funding LLC advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-2265]--[Edited 06/14/2019 by KR] (JPH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:32 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Fast Advance Funding LLC, received. [19-2265] (JPH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:27 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Fast Advance Funding LLC, filed. [19-2265] (JPH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:25 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Fast Advance Funding LLC, filed. [19-2265] (JPH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:23 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John P. Hartley, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Fast Advance Funding LLC. [19-2265] (JPH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:17 PM]

Open Document

Appendix Citation Notice sent to John P. Bartley, Esq., Cynthia A. Clark, Esq., Clayton S. Morrow, Esq., Bryan Reo, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/18/2019. (KR) [Entered: 06/04/2019 09:10 AM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Standing Order

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #3

District Court Memorandum 050819

Open Document #2

District Court Verdict 050819

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Fast Advance Funding LLC due on or before 09/09/2019. Appendix due on or before 09/09/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bryan Anthony Reo on behalf of Appellee(s) James Shelton. [19-2265] (BR) [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Fast Advance Funding LLC advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-2265]--[Edited 06/14/2019 by KR] (JPH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Fast Advance Funding LLC, received. [19-2265] (JPH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Fast Advance Funding LLC, filed. [19-2265] (JPH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Fast Advance Funding LLC, filed. [19-2265] (JPH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John P. Hartley, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Fast Advance Funding LLC. [19-2265] (JPH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 06/03/2019. (KR) [Entered: 06/04/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix Citation Notice sent to John P. Bartley, Esq., Cynthia A. Clark, Esq., Clayton S. Morrow, Esq., Bryan Reo, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/18/2019. (KR) [Entered: 06/04/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 06/04/2019 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Fast Advance Funding LLC in District Court No. 2-18-cv-02071. (KR) [Entered: 06/04/2019 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.