This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 06:02:55 (UTC).

James Porchie v. Alere Toxicology Services, Inc

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 James Porchie filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Alere Toxicology Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1133

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAMES E. PORCHIE

Defendant / Appellee

ALERE TOXICOLOGY SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Timothy Worth McAfee

Attorney at TIMOTHY W. MCAFEE, PLLC

P. O. Box 610, 408 Wood Avenue

Big Stone Gap, VA 24219

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert Lucas Hobbs

Attorney at ELLIOTT, LAWSON & MINOR, PC

110 Piedmont Avenue

Bristol, VA 24201-4159

Elizabeth Anne Laningham Bellamy

Attorney at ELLIOTT, LAWSON & MINOR, PC

110 Piedmont Avenue

Bristol, VA 24201-4159

Jason P. Bloom

Attorney at HAYNES & BOONE, LLP

2323 Victory Avenue

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE ISSUED to Alere Toxicology Services, Inc. requesting response to Motion to certify question to state court [ # 18 ]Response due 04/09/2021.[1000925940]. [21-1133] DL [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:25 PM]

#18

(#18) MOTION by James E. Porchie for certification of question to state court. Date and method of service: 03/30/2021 ecf. [1000925928] [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:19 PM]

#17

(#17) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 16 ] Number of days granted: 7. Opening brief and appendix due 04/07/2021. Response brief due 05/07/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000925913] [21-1133] DL [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:13 PM]

#16

(#16) MOTION by James E. Porchie to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix.. Date and method of service: 03/30/2021 ecf. [1000925886] [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 03/30/2021 03:59 PM]

#15

(#15) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James E. Porchie. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000923314] [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 03/25/2021 07:47 PM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Timothy W. McAfee for James E. Porchie. [1000923313] [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 03/25/2021 07:46 PM]

#13

(#13) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to James E. Porchie re: filing of appearance form, filing of disclosure form. Appearance form due on 03/29/2021 from Timothy Worth McAfee. Disclosure statement due from James E. Porchie on 03/29/2021. [21-1133] KH [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:13 AM]

#12

(#12) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ] Number of days granted: 16. Opening brief and appendix due 03/31/2021. Response brief due 04/30/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000910053] [21-1133] KH [Entered: 03/04/2021 10:00 AM]

#11

(#11) MOTION by James E. Porchie to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix Counsel for Appellant is positive for COVID until March 31, 2021 with Reply Brief to be due on April 30, 2021.. Date and method of service: 03/03/2021 ecf. [1000909753] [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 03/03/2021 05:17 PM]

#10

(#10) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. [21-1133] Robert Hobbs [Entered: 02/25/2021 11:20 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jason P. Bloom for Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. [1000904267] [21-1133] Jason Bloom [Entered: 02/23/2021 03:39 PM]

#8

(#8) Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000900001] [21-1133] Robert Hobbs [Entered: 02/17/2021 09:18 AM]

#7

(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by James E. Porchie. [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 02/16/2021 06:09 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000898840] [21-1133] Robert Hobbs [Entered: 02/15/2021 04:01 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Elizabeth Anne Laningham Bellamy for Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. [1000894689] [21-1133] Elizabeth Anne Bellamy [Entered: 02/05/2021 10:46 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert Lucas Hobbs for Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. [1000893780] [21-1133] Robert Hobbs [Entered: 02/04/2021 09:01 AM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/15/2021. Response Brief due 04/14/2021. [21-1133] KH [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:33 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:20-cv-00022-JPJ-PMS. [21-1133] KH [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:31 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE ISSUED to Alere Toxicology Services, Inc. requesting response to Motion to certify question to state court [ # 18 ]Response due 04/09/2021.[1000925940]. [21-1133] DL [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION by James E. Porchie for certification of question to state court. Date and method of service: 03/30/2021 ecf. [1000925928] [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 16 ] Number of days granted: 7. Opening brief and appendix due 04/07/2021. Response brief due 05/07/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000925913] [21-1133] DL [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION by James E. Porchie to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix.. Date and method of service: 03/30/2021 ecf. [1000925886] [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 03/30/2021 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James E. Porchie. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000923314] [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 03/25/2021 07:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Timothy W. McAfee for James E. Porchie. [1000923313] [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 03/25/2021 07:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to James E. Porchie re: filing of appearance form, filing of disclosure form. Appearance form due on 03/29/2021 from Timothy Worth McAfee. Disclosure statement due from James E. Porchie on 03/29/2021. [21-1133] KH [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ] Number of days granted: 16. Opening brief and appendix due 03/31/2021. Response brief due 04/30/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000910053] [21-1133] KH [Entered: 03/04/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by James E. Porchie to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix Counsel for Appellant is positive for COVID until March 31, 2021 with Reply Brief to be due on April 30, 2021.. Date and method of service: 03/03/2021 ecf. [1000909753] [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 03/03/2021 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. [21-1133] Robert Hobbs [Entered: 02/25/2021 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jason P. Bloom for Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. [1000904267] [21-1133] Jason Bloom [Entered: 02/23/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000900001] [21-1133] Robert Hobbs [Entered: 02/17/2021 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by James E. Porchie. [21-1133] Timothy McAfee [Entered: 02/16/2021 06:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000898840] [21-1133] Robert Hobbs [Entered: 02/15/2021 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Elizabeth Anne Laningham Bellamy for Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. [1000894689] [21-1133] Elizabeth Anne Bellamy [Entered: 02/05/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert Lucas Hobbs for Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. [1000893780] [21-1133] Robert Hobbs [Entered: 02/04/2021 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/15/2021. Response Brief due 04/14/2021. [21-1133] KH [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:20-cv-00022-JPJ-PMS. [21-1133] KH [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:20-cv-00022-JPJ-PMS. Case manager: KHancock. [21-1133] KH [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALERE TOXICOLOGY SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Patrick Bloom