This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/21/2022 at 06:16:58 (UTC).

James Obergefell, et al v. Richard Hodges, et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2014 James Obergefell, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Richard Hodges,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    14-3057

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant

CAMILLE JONES

Amicus Curiae and Intervenors

WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT

NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS

GARY J. GATES

PROFESSORS OF LAW ASSOCIATED WITH THE WILLIAMS INSTITUTE

ANSHE CHESED FAIRMOUNT TEMPLE OF BEACHWOOD

UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM

UNITARIAN UNIVERSALIST ASSOCIATION

GENERAL SYNOD OF THE UNITED CHURCH OF CHRIST

TIMOTHY BROUD

NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN LAWYERS

AMERICAN SOCIOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION

CRAIG SCHEIDLER

LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS

HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN

31 INDIVIDUAL FAITH LEADERS

RECONSTRUCTIONIST RABBINICAL COLLEGE AND JEWISH RECONSTRUCTIONIST COMMUNITIES

CHRIST CHURCH CATHEDRAL OF CINCINNATI

JULIE A. LAMERE

Plaintiff / Appellee

DAVID BRIAN MICHENER

71 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Emily J. Martin

Attorney at National Women's Law Center

11 Dupont Circle, N.W., Suite 800

Washington, DC 20036

Benjamin G. Shatz

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips

11355 W. Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Jeffrey S. Trachtman

Attorney at Kramer, Levin, Naftalis & Frankel

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Jaren Janghorbani

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Jacob Harris Hupart

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Alan B. Morrison

Attorney at George Washington University Law School

2000 H Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20052

Roberta A. Kaplan

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.

Attorney at Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

James D. Esseks

Attorney at ACLU

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Lisa Talmadge Meeks

Attorney at Newman & Meeks

215 E. Ninth Street, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Jacklyn Gonzales Martin

Attorney at City of Cincinnati Law Department

801 Plum Street, Suite 214

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Chase Strangio

Attorney at ACLU

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Other Attorneys

Ryan Lynn Richardson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

30 E. Broad Street, 25Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Gregory R. Nevins

Attorney at Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund

730 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 1070

Atlanta, GA 30308-1210

Bridget Carty Coontz

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

30 E. Broad Street, 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Felicia H. Ellsworth

Attorney at Wilmer Hale

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Zachery P. Keller

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

30 E. Broad Street, 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Alan Evan Schoenfeld

Attorney at Wilmer Hale

250 Greenwich Street, 7 World Trade Center

New York, NY 10007

Camilla B. Taylor

Attorney at Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund

11 E. Adams Street, Suite 1008

Chicago, IL 60603

Eric E. Murphy

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

30 E. Broad Street, 25Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#137

136 #2

judge order filed

136 #1

Cover Letter

#135

#134

#133

#132

#131

130 #1

Cover Letter

#10

#9

8 #2

Transcript Order

8 #1

Transcript Order

#7

#6

#5

#4

#1

148 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. [14-3057, 14-3464] (CB) [Entered: 08/17/2015 07:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) ORDER filed : In light of the United States Supreme Court's decision, see Obergefell v. Hodges, 135 S. Ct. 2584 (2015), these appeals are remanded to the district courts from which they originated to allow further proceedings as necessary. The appeals are closed, and the mandate shall issue forthwith. . Martha Craig Daughtrey, Circuit Judge; Jeffrey S. Sutton, Circuit Judge and Deborah L. Cook, Circuit Judge. [14-3057, 14-3464] (CB) [Entered: 08/17/2015 07:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) U.S. Supreme Court judgment filed : REVERSED, with costs to be recovered by petitioners. Amount: $26, 778.00 (in cases 14-556, 14-562 & 14-574); $7,431.80 (in case 14-571). Supreme Court Case No: 14-556, 07/28/2015. [14-3057, 14-3464] (CL) [Entered: 07/28/2015 02:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) U.S. Supreme Court opinion filed : REVERSED. Supreme Court Case No: 14-556. [14-3057, 14-3464] (CL) [Entered: 06/26/2015 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#133) NOTIFICATION filed by Ms. Dina Bernick Mishra for Gay & Lesbian Advocates & Defenders regarding withdrawal as counsel. Certificate of Service: 05/12/2015. (DBM) [Entered: 05/12/2015 10:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) U.S. Supreme Court letter filed granting the petitions for writs of certiorari limited to the following questions: 1) Does the Fourteenth Amendment require a state to license a marriage between two people of the same sex? 2) Does the Fourteenth Amendment require a state to recognize a marriage between two people of the same sex when their marriage was lawfully licensed and performed out-of-state? [ # 131 ] filed by James Obergefell.. Supreme Court Case No: 14-556, 01/20/2015.. [14-3057, 14-3464] (CL) [Entered: 01/20/2015 02:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) U.S. Supreme Court notice filed regarding a petition for a writ of certiorari filed by Appellee James Obergefell in 14-3057. Supreme Court Case No:14-556, 11/14/2014. [14-3057, 14-3464] (CL) [Entered: 11/20/2014 08:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : The judgment of the district court is REVERSED. Decision for publication. Martha Craig Daughtrey (DISSENTING), Jeffrey S. Sutton (AUTHORING) and Deborah L. Cook, Circuit Judges. [14-3057, 14-3464] (CL) [Entered: 11/06/2014 04:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) ORDER filed for substitution of Richard Hodges for Lance D. Himes, Interim Director of the Ohio Department of Health. [14-3057, 14-3464] *The order has been corrected to reflect that Richard Hodges is the current [not interim director] of the Ohio Department of Health.--[Edited 11/06/2014 by CL] (CL) [Entered: 11/06/2014 03:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) ADDITIONAL CITATION filed by Mr. Alphonse A. Gerhardstein for James Obergefell, John Arthur, David Brian Michener and Robert Grunn in 14-3057, Mr. Alphonse A. Gerhardstein for Brittani Henry, Brittni Rogers, Georgia Nicole Yorksmith, Pamela Yorksmith, Kelly Noe, Kelly McCracken, Joseph J. Vitale, Robert Talmas and Adoption S.T.A.R., Inc. in 14-3464. Certificate of Service: 10/07/2014. [14-3057, 14-3464] (AAG) [Entered: 10/07/2014 05:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Theodore Wymyslo, MD by Ryan L. Richardson. Certificate of Service: 01/28/2014. (RLR) [Entered: 01/28/2014 02:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Theodore Wymyslo, MD by Zachery P. Keller. Certificate of Service: 01/28/2014. (ZPK) [Entered: 01/28/2014 01:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Ms. Bridget Carty Coontz for Theodore Wymyslo, MD; transcript ordered on 01/28/2014 from Court Reporter Ms. Jodie D. Perkins and Ms. Mary Ann Ranz. [8] Certificate of Service: 01/28/2014. (COUNSEL ADVISED TO REFILE DOCUMENTS SEPARATELY)--[Edited 01/28/2014 by CB] (BCC) [Entered: 01/28/2014 01:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Bridget Carty Coontz for Appellant Theodore Wymyslo, MD Certificate of Service: 01/28/2014. (BCC) [Entered: 01/28/2014 01:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Bridget Carty Coontz for Appellant Theodore Wymyslo, MD. Certificate of Service:01/28/2014. (BCC) [Entered: 01/28/2014 01:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Theodore Wymyslo, MD by Bridget E. Coontz. Certificate of Service: 01/28/2014. (BCC) [Entered: 01/28/2014 01:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) A telephone mediation conference has been scheduled for 02/20/2014 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/24/2014 09:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 01/24/2014 08:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: cheryl borkowski (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2014 09:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Theodore Wymyslo, MD. Transcript needed: y. (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2014 09:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOMEN LAWYERS ASSOCIATION OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases where WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT is a litigant

Latest cases where UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM is a litigant

Latest cases where League of United Latin American Citizens is a litigant