This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/19/2019 at 06:01:54 (UTC).

James McConnell v. Watauga County

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 James McConnell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Watauga County. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1666

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES WATAUGA COUNTY

JENNIFER SMITH

WATAUGA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

CHAD SLAGLE

JESSICA WINEBARGER

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

JASKA H. ROMINGER

WATAUGA COUNTY

LEN D. HAGAMAN

THOMAS HUGHES

Plaintiff / Appellants

KIM MCCONNELL

JAMES EDWARD MCCONNELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Bradley O. Wood

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

1 West 4Th Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William Everett Moore Jr.

Attorney at GRAY, LAYTON, KERSH, SOLOMON, FURR & SMITH, PA

516 South New Hope Road, P. O. Box 2636

Gastonia, NC 28053-2636

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

RESTRICTED

#24

RESTRICTED

#20

#19

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER filed [1000564345] sealing sealed version of opening brief and joint appendix volumes 2-10. Copies to all parties. [19-1666] AB [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Corrected CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell. Sealing Required: No. Description of document referenced by certificate: Sealed Version of Opening Brief. [19-1666] William Moore [Entered: 08/09/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Corrected CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell. Sealing Required: No. Description of document referenced by certificate: Sealed Appendix Volumes 2-10. [19-1666] William Moore [Entered: 08/09/2019 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 20 ], [21], [22], [23] by James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [10]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [3682]. Total number of sealed volumes: 9. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 08/02/2019. [1000564367] [19-1666] AB [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Receipt of paper copy of redacted OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 19 ] by James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell. Number of pages: [70]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 08/02/2019. [1000564355] [19-1666] AB [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#29) Receipt of paper copy of SEALED BRIEF filed at [18] by James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell. Type of brief: OPENING. Number of pages: [70]. Number of copies: [1]. Filed ex parte: No. Received by clerk date: 08/02/2019. [1000564353] [19-1666] AB [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Sealed Version of Appellants Opening Brief. [19-1666]--[Edited 08/09/2019 by AB] AB [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Sealed Appendix Volumes. [19-1666]--[Edited 08/09/2019 by AB] William Moore [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#23) Joint SEALED APPENDIX VOLUME(S) (court access only) by James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to court: 07/31/2019.. Filed Ex parte: N. [19-1666] William Moore [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#22) Joint SEALED APPENDIX VOLUME(S) (court access only) by James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to court: 07/31/2019.. Filed Ex parte: N. [19-1666] William Moore [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Department of Social Services Watauga County. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000539638] [19-1666] Bradley Wood [Entered: 07/01/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Watauga County. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000539635] [19-1666] Bradley Wood [Entered: 07/01/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Western Surety Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000539631] [19-1666] Bradley Wood [Entered: 07/01/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bradley O. Wood for Department of Social Services Watauga County, Len D. Hagaman, Thomas Hughes, Jaska H. Rominger, Chad Slagle, Jennifer Smith, Watauga County, Watauga County Sheriff's Department, Western Surety Company and Jessica Winebarger. [1000539626] [19-1666] Bradley Wood [Entered: 07/01/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DOCKETING STATEMENT by James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell. [19-1666] William Moore [Entered: 06/27/2019 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000538039] [19-1666] William Moore [Entered: 06/27/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William E. Moore, Jr. for James Edward McConnell and Kim McConnell. [1000538038] [19-1666] William Moore [Entered: 06/27/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 07/30/2019. Response Brief due 08/29/2019 [19-1666] KH [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00195-MOC-DCK. [19-1666] KH [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00195-MOC-DCK. Case manager: KHancock. [19-1666] KH [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Watauga County is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William E. Moore, Jr.