This case was last updated from PACER on 05/13/2019 at 06:27:54 (UTC).

James McCalmont, et al v. FNMA/Fannie Mae, et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 James McCalmont filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against FNMA/Fannie Mae. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15455

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY, conservator for Federal National Mortgage Association

Plaintiff / Appellants

JAMES MCCALMONT, a married man

KATHERINE MCCALMONT, a married woman

Defendant / Appellee

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Paul B. Mengedoth

Attorney at Mengedoth Law PLLC

20909 N. 90Th Place

Scottsdale, AZ 85255

Sylvia A. Goldsmith

Attorney at Goldsmith & Associates, LLC

20545 Center Ridge Road, Suite 120

Rocky River, OH 44116

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Carlie Tovrea

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren Street

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Seth W. Lloyd

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Erica J. Stutman

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren Street

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Michael B. Miller

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9601

Brian Matsui

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Angela Elaine Kleine

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Gregory J. Marshall

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren Street

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Deanne Maynard

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11269180] (VS) [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:25 PM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 04/08/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11241102] (VS) [Entered: 03/25/2019 01:47 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants James McCalmont and Katherine McCalmont Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/22/2019. [11239360] [19-15455] (Mengedoth, Paul) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:12 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11238827] (LW) [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:30 AM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11269180] (VS) [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 04/08/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11241102] (VS) [Entered: 03/25/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • (#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11240033] (AD) [Entered: 03/22/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants James McCalmont and Katherine McCalmont Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/22/2019. [11239360] [19-15455] (Mengedoth, Paul) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11238827] (LW) [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • (#5) Added attorneys Brian Matsui, Deanne Maynard and Seth W. Lloyd for FNMA/Fannie Mae. [11233232] (RL) [Entered: 03/19/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Seth W. Lloyd for Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 03/18/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11231808] [19-15455] (Lloyd, Seth) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian R. Matsui for Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 03/18/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11231800] [19-15455] (Matsui, Brian) [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Deanne E. Maynard for Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 03/18/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11231794] [19-15455] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/21/2019. Transcript ordered by 04/12/2019. Transcript due 05/13/2019. Appellants James McCalmont and Katherine McCalmont opening brief due 06/21/2019. Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association answering brief due 07/22/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11227192] (JBS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less