This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:01:02 (UTC).

James Lewis v. USA

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 James Lewis filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10788

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner / Appellant

JAMES LEWIS

Fort Worth, TX 76119

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1205 Texas Avenue

Lubbock, TX 79401

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

James Lewis

Attorney at FMC Fort Worth

P.O. Box 15330

Fort Worth, TX 76119

 

Court Documents

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9103283-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Motion for IFP is pending in DC. [19-10788] (CB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 07:27 AM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. James Lewis [19-10788] (LEF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:05 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 10/01/2019 for Appellant James Lewis. [19-10788] (MVM) [Entered: 08/22/2019 08:58 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10788] (CMB) [Entered: 08/28/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 10/01/2019 for Appellant James Lewis. [19-10788] (MVM) [Entered: 08/22/2019 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-2306. Electronic ROA due on 09/06/2019. [19-10788] (MVM) [Entered: 08/22/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 08/12/2019 granting IFP for Appellant Mr. James Lewis. [19-10788] (MVM) [Entered: 08/22/2019 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. James Lewis. [19-10788] (CB) [Entered: 08/08/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9103283-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Motion for IFP is pending in DC. [19-10788] (CB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 07:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. James Lewis [19-10788] (LEF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.