This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2020 at 06:17:05 (UTC).

James Jensen, et al v. MN Dept. of Human Services, et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 James Jensen filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MN Dept of Human Services. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1126

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Director, Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota

Clinical Director, the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota

Douglas Bratvold, individually, and as Director of the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a progam of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota

Scott TenNapel, individually, and as Clinicial Director of the Minnesota Extended Treatment Options, a program of the Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota

Plaintiff / Appellees

Darren Allen, as parents, guardians and next friends of Thomas M. Allbrink and others similarly situated

James Brinker

James Jensen

Elizabeth Jacobs, as parent, guardian and next friend of Jason R. Jacobs and others similarly situated

Lorie Jensen, as parents, guardians and next friends of Bradley J. Jensen and others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellants

Minnesota Department of Human Services, an agency of the State of Minnesota

State of Minnesota

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Shamus Patrick O'Meara

Attorney at O'MEARA & LEER

Suite 600, 7401 Metro Boulevard

Minneapolis, MN 55439-3034

Mark R. Azman

Attorney at O'MEARA & LEER

Suite 600, 7401 Metro Boulevard

Minneapolis, MN 55439-3034

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Anthony R. Noss

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Suite 1400, 445 Minnesota Street

Saint Paul, MN 55101-2127

Scott Hiromi Ikeda

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Suite 1400, 445 Minnesota Street

Saint Paul, MN 55101-2127

Aaron Edward Winter

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Suite 1400, 445 Minnesota Street

Saint Paul, MN 55101-2127

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance pending ruling on motion to dismiss. [4892118] [20-1126, 20-1399] (LMT) [Entered: 03/17/2020 11:36 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen in 20-1399, Attorney Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. James Jensen, Ms. Lorie Jensen, Mr. James Brinker, Mr. Darren Allen and Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs in 20-1126 correcting [ # 4890894-2 ] motion filed by null in 20-1399. [4891547] [20-1399, 20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:44 AM]

Open Document #2

Certificate of Compliance

Open Document #1

Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126. Transcript ordered for April 16, 2019 hearing. [4890585] [20-1399, 20-1126] --[Edited 03/12/2020 by BNW to correct docket text to show transcript was ordered.] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:53 AM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126 - Separate Appendix - w/service 03/12/2020 [4890573] [20-1399, 20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:44 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126 - w/service 03/12/2020. [4890571] [20-1399, 20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:37 AM]

Open Document

JUDGE ORDER:Denying [ # 4879552-2 ] motion for stay filed by Mr. Scott Hiromi Ikeda for appellants. Adp Feb 2020 [4888312] [20-1126] (LMT) [Entered: 03/05/2020 12:19 PM]

Open Document #1

Defendants-Appellants Minnesota Department Of Human Services, An Agency Of The S

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota. No Transcript[4877822] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:36 AM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota - Separate Appendix - w/service 02/04/2020 [4877810] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:24 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota - w/service 02/04/2020. [4877797] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:19 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Scott H. Ikeda for Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota w/service 01/22/2020 [4873545] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 01/22/2020 12:08 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Shamus P. O'Meara for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen w/service 01/22/2020 [4873528] [20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:37 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Mark. R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen w/service 01/22/2020 [4873527] [20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:35 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 03/02/2020. Appendix due 03/11/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota due 03/11/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4872930] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:09 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order of 12/18/2019, notice of appeal [4872921] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:06 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4872912] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:01 AM]

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance pending ruling on motion to dismiss. [4892118] [20-1126, 20-1399] (LMT) [Entered: 03/17/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen in 20-1399, Attorney Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. James Jensen, Ms. Lorie Jensen, Mr. James Brinker, Mr. Darren Allen and Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs in 20-1126 correcting [ # 4890894-2 ] motion filed by null in 20-1399. [4891547] [20-1399, 20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketOn December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/petitions filed under [Rule 27], certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion/petition did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion to dismiss case, [ # 4890894-2 ], , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [20-1126, 20-1399] CERTIFICATE HAS INCORRECT CASE NUMBER AT HEADING (LMT) [Entered: 03/16/2020 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss case, filed by Mr. Mark R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen and Mr. Shamus Patrick O'Meara for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen in 20-1399 w/service 03/12/2020. [4890894] [20-1399, 20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 03/12/2020 06:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketRECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Status Conference [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 04/16/2019, No. of Pgs.: 161, Court Reporter: Krenz, Lynne [4890733] [20-1126, 20-1399] (STL) [Entered: 03/12/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126. Transcript ordered for April 16, 2019 hearing. [4890585] [20-1399, 20-1126] --[Edited 03/12/2020 by BNW to correct docket text to show transcript was ordered.] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126 - Separate Appendix - w/service 03/12/2020 [4890573] [20-1399, 20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota in 20-1399, 20-1126 - w/service 03/12/2020. [4890571] [20-1399, 20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE ORDER:Denying [ # 4879552-2 ] motion for stay filed by Mr. Scott Hiromi Ikeda for appellants. Adp Feb 2020 [4888312] [20-1126] (LMT) [Entered: 03/05/2020 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketRECORD FILED - SEALED RECORDS, Location STL, Comments: 1 envelope containing Sealed District Court document #800 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN [4886109] [20-1126, 20-1399] (STL) [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for stay, filed by Attorney Mr. Scott Hiromi Ikeda for Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota w/service 02/07/2020. [4879552] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/07/2020 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota. No Transcript[4877822] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota - Separate Appendix - w/service 02/04/2020 [4877810] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota - w/service 02/04/2020. [4877797] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Scott H. Ikeda for Appellants Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota w/service 01/22/2020 [4873545] [20-1126] (SHI) [Entered: 01/22/2020 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Shamus P. O'Meara for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen w/service 01/22/2020 [4873528] [20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Mark. R. Azman for Appellees Mr. Darren Allen, Mr. James Brinker, Ms. Elizabeth Jacobs, Mr. James Jensen and Ms. Lorie Jensen w/service 01/22/2020 [4873527] [20-1126] (MRA) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 03/02/2020. Appendix due 03/11/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Minnesota Department of Human Services and State of Minnesota due 03/11/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4872930] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order of 12/18/2019, notice of appeal [4872921] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4872912] [20-1126] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less