This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/20/2022 at 06:04:37 (UTC).

James Hall v. G.M.S. Management Co., Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 James Hall filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against G M S Management Co , Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-4210

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAMES WILLIAM HALL

Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44223

Defendant / Appellees

JAMES R. OGDEN

JUDGE DAVID E. FISH

ANDREW F. PECK, Former U.S. Magistrate Judge

JUDGE JENNIFER L. HENSAL

JUDGE THOMAS A. TEODOSIO

JUDGE TODD MCKINNEY

JUDGE JULIE A. SCHAFER

JUDGE LYNNE S. CALLAHAN

JUDGE DONNA J. CARR

JUDGE MARY MARGARET ROWLANDS

OHIO COURT OF CLAIMS AND JUDGES

GMS MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC.

BARBERTON, OH MUNICIPAL COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

James William Hall

State Route 8, P.O. Box 1123

Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44223

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Paul M. Greenberger

Attorney at Berns, Ockner & Greenberger

3733 Park E. Drive, Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44122

Frank H. Scialdone

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Cleveland, OH 44139

Edmond Z. Jaber

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Cleveland, OH 44139

Terence L. Williams

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Cleveland, OH 44139

Michael Walton

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

30 E. Broad Street, 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Andrew David McCartney

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

30 E. Broad Street, 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Cooper David Bowen

Attorney at Montgomery Jonson

600 Vine Street, Suite 2650

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. James William Hall. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 12/22/2021 03:18 PM]

#4

(#4) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/03/2022; appellee brief due 03/08/2022. (SSS) [Entered: 12/22/2021 03:22 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barberton, OH Municipal Court, David E. Fish, Andrew F. Peck and Todd McKinney by Frank H. Scialdone. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4210] (FHS) [Entered: 01/03/2022 04:55 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barberton, OH Municipal Court, David E. Fish, Todd McKinney and Andrew F. Peck by Terence L. Williams. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4210] (TLW) [Entered: 01/03/2022 04:59 PM]

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Terence L. Williams for Appellees Barberton, OH Municipal Court, David E. Fish, Todd McKinney and Andrew F. Peck Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4210] (TLW) [Entered: 01/03/2022 05:00 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ohio Court Of Claims And Judges, Thomas A. Teodosio, Jennifer L. Hensal, Lynne S. Callahan, Donna J. Carr and Julie A. Schafer by Michael A. Walton. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4210] (MW) [Entered: 01/04/2022 01:10 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ohio Court Of Claims And Judges, Thomas A. Teodosio, Jennifer L. Hensal, Lynne S. Callahan, Donna J. Carr and Julie A. Schafer by Andrew D. McCartney. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4210] (ADM) [Entered: 01/04/2022 01:12 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees GMS Management Company, Inc. and James R. Ogden by Paul M. Greenberger. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4210] (PMG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 02:36 PM]

#11

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Paul M. Greenberger for Appellees GMS Management Company, Inc. and James R. Ogden Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4210] (PMG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 02:40 PM]

#14

(#14) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. James William Hall Certificate of Service:02/01/2022. Argument Request: requested. (SSS) [Entered: 02/02/2022 02:31 PM]

#15

(#15) Supplemental pleading filed by Party Mr. James William Hall. Document: Exhibits in support of brief. (SSS) [Entered: 02/07/2022 05:15 PM]

16 #1

appearance form

16 #2

Additional Document

#17

(#17) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barberton, OH Municipal Court, David E. Fish, Andrew F. Peck and Todd McKinney by Edmond Z. Jaber. Certificate of Service: 02/14/2022. [21-4210] (EZJ) [Entered: 02/14/2022 08:50 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barberton, OH Municipal Court, David E. Fish, Andrew F. Peck and Todd McKinney by Edmond Z. Jaber. Certificate of Service: 02/14/2022. [21-4210] (EZJ) [Entered: 02/14/2022 08:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) **DEFECTIVE ENTRY**APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mary Margaret Rowlands by Lisa M. Zaring. Certificate of Service: 02/09/2022. [21-4210]-Counsel is advised to use the appearance form provided on the court's website and attorneys must refile under their own PACER account.--[Edited 02/09/2022 by SSS] (LMZ) [Entered: 02/09/2022 01:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Supplemental pleading filed by Party Mr. James William Hall. Document: Exhibits in support of brief. (SSS) [Entered: 02/07/2022 05:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. James William Hall Certificate of Service:02/01/2022. Argument Request: requested. (SSS) [Entered: 02/02/2022 02:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTIFICATION of PACER docket error for appearance form , [ # 11 ], filed by Mr. Paul M. Greenberger for GMS Management Company, Inc. and James R. Ogden. Attorneys must use their personal PACER account to file any document and are not permitted to use their account to file on behalf of another attorney. Please refile using your own account within 24 hours. (SSS) [Entered: 01/05/2022 09:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Paul M. Greenberger for Appellees GMS Management Company, Inc. and James R. Ogden Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4210] (PMG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 02:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) **LOCKED**APPEARANCE filed for Appellees GMS Management Company, Inc. and James R. Ogden by Elizabeth Wells Rothenberg. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4210]-Attorneys must use their personal PACER account to file any document and are not permitted to use their account to file on behalf of another attorney.--[Edited 01/05/2022 by SSS] (PMG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 02:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees GMS Management Company, Inc. and James R. Ogden by Paul M. Greenberger. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4210] (PMG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 02:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ohio Court Of Claims And Judges, Thomas A. Teodosio, Jennifer L. Hensal, Lynne S. Callahan, Donna J. Carr and Julie A. Schafer by Andrew D. McCartney. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4210] (ADM) [Entered: 01/04/2022 01:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ohio Court Of Claims And Judges, Thomas A. Teodosio, Jennifer L. Hensal, Lynne S. Callahan, Donna J. Carr and Julie A. Schafer by Michael A. Walton. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4210] (MW) [Entered: 01/04/2022 01:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Terence L. Williams for Appellees Barberton, OH Municipal Court, David E. Fish, Todd McKinney and Andrew F. Peck Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4210] (TLW) [Entered: 01/03/2022 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barberton, OH Municipal Court, David E. Fish, Todd McKinney and Andrew F. Peck by Terence L. Williams. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4210] (TLW) [Entered: 01/03/2022 04:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barberton, OH Municipal Court, David E. Fish, Andrew F. Peck and Todd McKinney by Frank H. Scialdone. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4210] (FHS) [Entered: 01/03/2022 04:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/03/2022; appellee brief due 03/08/2022. (SSS) [Entered: 12/22/2021 03:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 12/22/2021 03:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. James William Hall. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 12/22/2021 03:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edmond Z. Jaber

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew D. Mccartney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cooper D Bowen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank H. Scialdone