This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/03/2022 at 11:14:43 (UTC).

James Ginzkey, et al v. National Securities Corp.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 James Ginzkey filed an Other lawsuit against National Securities Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-80048

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL SECURITIES CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation

Respondents

BARRY DONNER, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

CHARLES CERF

RICHARD FITZGERALD

JAMES GINZKEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Douglas W. Greene

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

999 3Rd Avenue, Suite 3600

Seattle, WA 98104

James Morrison

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

999 3Rd Avenue, Suite 3900

Seattle, WA 98104

Respondent Attorneys

Joseph Wojciechowski

233 S. Wacker, 84Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Sara Hanley

Attorney at Hanley Law, P.A.

365 Fifth Avenue S., Suite 202

Naples, FL 34102

Joshua B. Kons

Attorney at Law Offices of Joshua B. Kons, LLC

92 Hopmeadow Street

Weatogue, CT 06089

Joseph R. Wojciechowski

Attorney at Stoltmann Law Offices, PC

600 Hart Road, Suite 115

Barrington, IL 60010

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Petition for Permission to Appeal

1 #4

Excerpts of Record Index

1 #5

Excerpts of Record Vol 1

1 #6

Excerpts of Record Vol 2

1 #7

Excerpts of Record Vol 3

1 #8

Excerpts of Record Vol 4

1 #9

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#3

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed order (JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON and LAWRENCE VANDYKE) The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the district courts April 27, 2021, order granting class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005). [12175169] (OC) [Entered: 07/16/2021 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Petitioner National Securities Corporation reply to answer to 23f petition. Date of service: 05/27/2021. [12127509] [21-80048] (Morrison, James) [Entered: 05/27/2021 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) Sara Hanley for party(s) Respondent Barry Donner Respondent Richard Fitzgerald Respondent James Ginzkey Respondent Charles Cerf, in case 21-80048. [12122195] (NAC) [Entered: 05/24/2021 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sara Elizabeth Hanley (Stoltmann Law Offices, P.C. 600 Hart Rd, Ste. 115 Barrington, IL 60010) for Respondents Charles Cerf, Barry Donner, Richard Fitzgerald and James Ginzkey. Date of service: 05/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12122185] [21-80048] (Hanley, Sara) [Entered: 05/24/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Joshua B. Kons for party(s) Respondent Barry Donner Respondent Richard Fitzgerald Respondent James Ginzkey Respondent Charles Cerf, in case 21-80048. [12119325] (JFF) [Entered: 05/20/2021 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Respondents Charles Cerf, Barry Donner, Richard Fitzgerald and James Ginzkey answer to 23f petition. Date of service: 05/20/2021. [12119220] [21-80048] (Wojciechowski, Joseph) [Entered: 05/20/2021 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua Bradford Kons (Law Offices of Joshua B. Kons, LLC, 92 Hopmeadow Street, Lower Level, Weatogue, CT 06089) for Respondents Charles Cerf, Barry Donner, Richard Fitzgerald and James Ginzkey. Date of service: 05/20/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12119176] [21-80048] (Kons, Joshua) [Entered: 05/20/2021 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED ON 05/11/2021 PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO RULE 23(f). SERVED ON 05/11/2021. [12110232] (JBS) [Entered: 05/12/2021 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Securities Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Morrison

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas W Greene