This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/26/2022 at 09:11:42 (UTC).

James Conerly, et al v. Kaiser Permanente, et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 James Conerly filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Kaiser Permanente. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16603

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

JAMES CONERLY

Sacramento, CA 95835

MARILYN TILLMAN-CONERLY

Sacramento, CA 95835

CARINA CONERLY

Sacramento, CA 95835

M. T.

Defendant / Appellees

KAISER PERMANENTE

SABRINA V. KO

ANDREW K. LEE

TERI L. TROLIO

LIEN QUOC TRAN

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

CALHR

MAKAY BUTZ

ERAINA ORTEGA

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO

NORA WILLIAMS

JUNE D. COLEMAN

LAURI DAMRELL

CME

VERACITY RESEARCH COMPANY

SHAW LAW GROUP, PC

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James Conerly

1501 Amazon Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95835

Marilyn Tillman-Conerly

1501 Amazon Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95835

Carina Conerly

1501 Amazon Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95835

M. T.

1501 Amazon Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95835

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kelly Simone Bresso

5880 Owens Drivethird Floor

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Kelly S. Bresso

Attorney at State Compensation Insurance Fund

5880 Owens Drive3Rd Floor

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Elizabeth P. Krehe

Attorney at CA Department of Human Resources

1515 S Street

Sacramento, CA 95811

Christopher E. Thomas

Attorney at CA Department of Human Resources

1515 S Street

Sacramento, CA 95811

Erick J. Rhoan Esquire

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Streetsuite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

David Davidson

Attorney at David Davidson

32 Vivido Street

Ladera Ranch, CA 92694

Matthew Szwajkowski

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer, LLC

1 E Wacker Drivesuite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

Carlos K. Poza

Attorney at Manning Gross & Massenburg LLP

100 Pringle Avenue

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Timothy Del Castillo

Attorney at Castle Law: California Employment Counsel, PC

2999 Douglas Boulevardsuite 180

Roseville, CA 95661

Other Attorneys

John Thomas Kennedy Esquire III

Attorney at Nossaman LLP

621 Capitol Mall,

Sacramento, CA 95814

Nicole Lynn Heeder

Attorney at SEIU Local 1000

1808 14Th Street

Sacramento, CA 95811

Juhyung Harold Lee

510 South Marengo Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91101-3115

Glenn Rothner

Attorney at Rothner, Segall & Greenstone

510 South Marengo Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91101-3115

Bessida Taonda

1507 Amazon Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95835

Lassane Bonkoungou

1507 Amazon Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95835

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees SEIU International and Mary Kay Henry. Date of service: 01/25/2022. [12351076] [21-16603] (Rothner, Glenn) [Entered: 01/25/2022 04:06 PM]

#29

(#29) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 27 ] submitted by Shaw Law Group, PC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12349488] (KWG) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:17 PM]

27 #2

Certificate of Service

27 #1

Main Document

#25

(#25) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 17 ] submitted by Veracity Research Company is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The excerpts of record [ # 18 ] submitted by Veracity Research Company are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12348411] (KWG) [Entered: 01/24/2022 09:07 AM]

#26

(#26) Filed original and 0 copies of Appellants Carina Conerly and James Conerly reply brief of 4 pages (Informal: No). Served on 01/16/2022. [12348419] (KWG) [Entered: 01/24/2022 09:11 AM]

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

(#24) 12332612COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 18 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Veracity Research Company. Date of service: 01/21/2022. [12348138] [21-16603] (Poza, Carlos) [Entered: 01/21/2022 06:56 PM]

#17

(#23) COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 17 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Veracity Research Company. Date of service: 01/21/2022. [12348137] [21-16603] (Poza, Carlos) [Entered: 01/21/2022 06:54 PM]

#16

No Description Available

#9

(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellee CME corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 12/08/2021. [12309907] [21-16603] (Szwajkowski, Matthew) [Entered: 12/08/2021 11:51 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed original and 7 copies of Appellants Carina Conerly, James Conerly, and Marilyn Tillman-Conerly opening brief of 39 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 11/23/2021. [12298169]--[COPURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect all party filers. 11/24/2021 by KWG] (KWG) [Entered: 11/24/2021 03:52 PM]

#3

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Main Document

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees SEIU International and Mary Kay Henry. Date of service: 01/25/2022. [12351076] [21-16603] (Rothner, Glenn) [Entered: 01/25/2022 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 27 ] submitted by Shaw Law Group, PC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12349488] (KWG) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 27 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Errata to Answering Brief ([ # 27 ] Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing)). Filed by Appellee Shaw Law Group, PC. Date of service: 01/24/2022. [12349191] [21-16603] (Del Castillo, Timothy) [Entered: 01/24/2022 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Shaw Law Group, PC. Date of service: 01/24/2022. [12348911] [21-16603]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached certificate of service. 01/24/2022 by KWG] (Del Castillo, Timothy) [Entered: 01/24/2022 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 17 ] submitted by Veracity Research Company is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The excerpts of record [ # 18 ] submitted by Veracity Research Company are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12348411] (KWG) [Entered: 01/24/2022 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) 12332612COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 18 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Veracity Research Company. Date of service: 01/21/2022. [12348138] [21-16603] (Poza, Carlos) [Entered: 01/21/2022 06:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 17 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Veracity Research Company. Date of service: 01/21/2022. [12348137] [21-16603] (Poza, Carlos) [Entered: 01/21/2022 06:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Filed original and 0 copies of Appellants Carina Conerly and James Conerly reply brief of 4 pages (Informal: No). Served on 01/16/2022. [12348419] (KWG) [Entered: 01/24/2022 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#22) Terminated Juhyung Harold Lee for SEIU International and Mary Kay Henry in 21-16603 [12342250] (DJV) [Entered: 01/18/2022 06:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#21) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Juhyung Harold Lee for Appellees Mary Kay Henry and SEIU International. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 01/14/2022. [12341289] [21-16603] (Lee, Juhyung) [Entered: 01/14/2022 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellee CME corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 12/08/2021. [12309907] [21-16603] (Szwajkowski, Matthew) [Entered: 12/08/2021 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew Edward Szwajkowski (O'Hagan Meyer LLC, One East Wacker Drive Suite 3400, Chicago, Illinois 60601) for Appellees Charmaine Aceituno and CME. Date of service: 12/08/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12309903] [21-16603] (Szwajkowski, Matthew) [Entered: 12/08/2021 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Christopher E. Thomas for party(s) Appellee CalHR Appellee Stacy Miranda Appellee Eraina Ortega Appellee Makay Butz Appellee Karla Yvonne Broussard-Boyd, in case 21-16603. [12302261] (DJV) [Entered: 12/01/2021 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher E. Thomas (California Department of Human Resources; 1515 S Street, Suite 400N, Sacramento, CA 95811) for Appellees Karla Yvonne Broussard-Boyd, Makay Butz, CalHR, Stacy Miranda and Eraina Ortega. Date of service: 12/01/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12302250] [21-16603] (Thomas, Christopher) [Entered: 12/01/2021 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed original and 7 copies of Appellants Carina Conerly, James Conerly, and Marilyn Tillman-Conerly opening brief of 39 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 11/23/2021. [12298169]--[COPURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect all party filers. 11/24/2021 by KWG] (KWG) [Entered: 11/24/2021 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#4) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 10/12/2021. [12256585] (RT) [Entered: 10/14/2021 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellants Carina Conerly, James Conerly and Marilyn Tillman-Conerly motion to correct the parties names. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/06/2021. [12253407] (DJV) [Entered: 10/12/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12245814] (CKP) [Entered: 10/03/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12245814] (CKP) [Entered: 10/03/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Carina Conerly, James Conerly, M. T. and Marilyn Tillman-Conerly opening brief due 11/26/2021. Appellees Kaiser Permanente, et al answering brief due 12/27/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12244153] (JPD) [Entered: 09/30/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Veracity Research Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CME is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant