This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2019 at 06:09:15 (UTC).

James Banneck v. FNMA/Fannie Mae, et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 James Banneck filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against FNMA/Fannie Mae. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15468

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee

FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY

Defendant / Appellee

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAMES BANNECK, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael A. Johnson

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

David Eric Shapland

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

777 S. Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Seth W. Lloyd

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Deanne Maynard

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Danielle Nicole Oakley Esquire

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

610 Newport Center Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Brian Matsui

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Elizabeth Lemond McKeen Esquire

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

610 Newport Center Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Paul B. Mengedoth

Attorney at Mengedoth Law PLLC

20909 N. 90Th Place

Scottsdale, AZ 85255

Stephanie Tatar

Attorney at Tatar Law Firm, APC

3500 West Olive Avenue, Suite 300

Burbank, CA 91505

James A. Francis Esquire

Attorney at Francis and Mailman PC

1600 Market Street, Suite 2510

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Sylvia A. Goldsmith

Attorney at Goldsmith & Associates, LLC

20545 Center Ridge Road, Suite 120

Rocky River, OH 44116

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant FHFA in 19-15594, Appellee FHFA in 19-15468 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/05/2019. [11254754] [19-15594, 19-15468] (Johnson, Michael) [Entered: 04/05/2019 02:31 PM]

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

#1

Docketing Letter

9 #3

Cross Appeal Chart

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 04/10/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11242421] (VS) [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:05 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant James Banneck Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/22/2019. [11239640] [19-15468] (Mengedoth, Paul) [Entered: 03/22/2019 03:19 PM]

9 #4

Case Opening Packet

9 #1

Docketing Letter

1 #3

Mediation Letter

#12

(#12) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11260505] (VS) [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:19 AM]

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

9 #2

Mediation Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11260505] (VS) [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • (#11) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/05/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11255219] (AD) [Entered: 04/05/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant FHFA in 19-15594, Appellee FHFA in 19-15468 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/05/2019. [11254754] [19-15594, 19-15468] (Johnson, Michael) [Entered: 04/05/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/05/2019. First cross appeal brief due 06/21/2019 for James Banneck. Second brief on cross appeal due 07/22/2019 for Federal Housing Finance Agency and Federal National Mortgage Association. Third brief on cross appeal due 08/22/2019 for James Banneck. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Federal Housing Finance Agency is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11246940] [19-15594, 19-15468] (RT) [Entered: 03/29/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 04/10/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11242421] (VS) [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • (#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11240035] (AD) [Entered: 03/22/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant James Banneck Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/22/2019. [11239640] [19-15468] (Mengedoth, Paul) [Entered: 03/22/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • (#5) Added attorneys Brian Matsui, Deanne Maynard, Seth W. Lloyd for FNMA/Fannie Mae, in case 19-15468. [11232306] (QDL) [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Seth W. Lloyd for Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 03/18/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11231871] [19-15468] (Lloyd, Seth) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian R. Matsui for Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 03/18/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11231866] [19-15468] (Matsui, Brian) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Deanne E. Maynard for Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 03/18/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11231859] [19-15468] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/22/2019. Transcript ordered by 04/12/2019. Transcript due 05/13/2019. Appellant James Banneck opening brief due 06/21/2019. Appellees Federal Housing Finance Agency and Federal National Mortgage Association answering brief due 07/22/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11228974] (JMR) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.