This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2020 at 06:05:31 (UTC).

Jamal Hill v. State of Arizona, et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Jamal Hill filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Arizona. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15204

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAMAL JABARR HILL

Florence, AZ 85132

Defendant / Appellees

JEFF FINE, Clerk of Superior Court at Jeff Fine Court Building

CHARLES L. RYAN, Director of Department of Corrections at Central Office, Phoenix, AZ

STATE OF ARIZONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jamal Jabarr Hill

Attorney at ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX - EYMAN

P.O. Box 4000

Florence, AZ 85132

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Filed Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill response to 2/24/20 order. Served on 03/02/2020. [11620723] (CW) [Entered: 03/06/2020 11:12 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill response to 2/24/20 order. Served on 02/03/2020. [11616913] (CW) [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:00 PM]

#5

(#5) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill opening brief of 6 pages (Informal: No). Served on 02/26/2020. Major deficiency: briefing is stayed. [11613346] (LA) [Entered: 02/28/2020 03:24 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/06/2020. [11613233] (CW) [Entered: 02/28/2020 02:47 PM]

3 #4

Additional Document

#3

Additional Document

3 #2

Additional Document

3 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court, filed 2/10/20. [11596230] (CW) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:02 AM]

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill response to 2/24/20 order. Served on 03/02/2020. [11620723] (CW) [Entered: 03/06/2020 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill response to 2/24/20 order. Served on 02/03/2020. [11616913] (CW) [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill opening brief of 6 pages (Informal: No). Served on 02/26/2020. Major deficiency: briefing is stayed. [11613346] (LA) [Entered: 02/28/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/06/2020. [11613233] (CW) [Entered: 02/28/2020 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has certified that this appeal is not taken in good faith and has revoked appellants in forma pauperis status. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If the court dismisses the appeal as frivolous, this appeal may be counted as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [11606393] (CKP) [Entered: 02/24/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court, filed 2/10/20. [11596230] (CW) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill opening brief due 03/30/2020. [11594430] (JBS) [Entered: 02/12/2020 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.