This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2020 at 06:05:06 (UTC).

Jamal Hill v. State of Arizona

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Jamal Hill filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Arizona. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15200

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAMAL JABARR HILL

Florence, AZ 85132

Defendant / Appellee

STATE OF ARIZONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jamal Jabarr Hill

Attorney at ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX - EYMAN

P.O. Box 4000

Florence, AZ 85132

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/23/2020. [11648906] (CW) [Entered: 04/01/2020 02:11 PM]

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Main Document

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/23/2020. [11648906] (CW) [Entered: 04/01/2020 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11634775] (CKP) [Entered: 03/18/2020 07:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEE. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jamal Jabarr Hill opening brief due 03/30/2020. [11594265] (JBS) [Entered: 02/12/2020 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.