This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2021 at 06:17:52 (UTC).

Jamahl Simmons v. Michael Donovan, et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Jamahl Simmons filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Michael Donovan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1520

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MICHAEL T. DONOVAN

ZANE D. MEMEGER

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAMAHL SIMMONS, in propria persona

3946 Carpenter Avenue

Studio City, CA 91604

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Lauren E. DeBruicker Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jamahl Simmons

3946 Carpenter Avenue

Studio City, CA 91604

 

Court Documents

5 #3

Briefing Info for Pro Se Litigants

5 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

5 #1

Standing Order

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren DeBruicker, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) Michael T. Donovan; Zane D. Memeger. [21-1520] (LED) [Entered: 03/19/2021 05:03 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Memorandum

#1

Notice of Appeal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Jamahl Simmons due on or before 05/25/2021. Appendix due on or before 05/25/2021. (SB) [Entered: 04/15/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#4) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 04/02/2020. (SB) [Entered: 04/15/2021 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren DeBruicker, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) Michael T. Donovan; Zane D. Memeger. [21-1520] (LED) [Entered: 03/19/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 03/19/2021 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jamahl Simmons in District Court No. 2-19-cv-02954. (AMR) [Entered: 03/19/2021 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less