This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/21/2020 at 06:05:07 (UTC).

Jaison Cianelli v. Nourison Industries Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Jaison Cianelli filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Nourison Industries Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2910

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

NOURISON INDUSTRIES INC

KOHLS CORP

QVC INC

WALMART INC

HOME DEPOT USA INC

BED BATH & BEYOND

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAISON CIANELLI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Henry A. Gabathuler Esq.

Attorney at Leason Ellis

1 Barker Avenue, 5Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10601

Lauren B. Sabol Esq.

Attorney at Leason Ellis

1 Barker Avenue, 5Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10601

Yuval H. Marcus Esq.

Attorney at Leason Ellis

1 Barker Avenue, 5Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10601

Mark Rottenberg Esq.

Attorney at Rottenberg Lipman Rich

230 Park Avenue, 18Th Floor, The Helmsley Building

New York, NY 10169

C. Zachary Rosenberg Esq.

Attorney at Rottenberg Lipman Rich

230 Park Avenue, 18Th Floor, The Helmsley Building

New York, NY 10169

Christopher J. Robinson Esq.

Attorney at Rottenberg Lipman Rich

230 Park Avenue, 18Th Floor, The Helmsley Building

New York, NY 10169

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ben D. Manevitz Esq.

25 Main Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Craig B. Sanders Esq.

Attorney at Barshay Sanders

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

18 #1

Mediation Instructions

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christopher J. Robinson on behalf of Respondent(s) QVC, Inc.. [20-2910] (CJR) [Entered: 10/23/2020 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 10/22/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Jaison Cianelli. [20-2910] (CBS) [Entered: 10/21/2020 08:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Craig B. Sanders, Esq. for Jaison Cianelli requesting Concise Summary on or before 10/21/2020. (CJG) [Entered: 10/07/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee QVC Inc. [20-2910] (CZR) [Entered: 10/06/2020 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from C. Zachary Rosenberg on behalf of Respondent(s) QVC, Inc.. [20-2910] (CZR) [Entered: 10/06/2020 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee WalMart Inc. [20-2910] (YHM) [Entered: 10/06/2020 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Kohls Corp. [20-2910] (YHM) [Entered: 10/06/2020 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Home Depot USA Inc. [20-2910] (YHM) [Entered: 10/06/2020 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Bed Bath & Beyond. [20-2910] (YHM) [Entered: 10/06/2020 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Nourison Industries Inc. [20-2910] (YHM) [Entered: 10/06/2020 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren Sabol on behalf of Appellee(s) Nourison Industries, Inc., Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Walmart Inc.. [20-2910] (LBS) [Entered: 10/05/2020 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Yuval Marcus on behalf of Appellee(s) Nourison Industries, Inc., Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Walmart Inc.. [20-2910] (YHM) [Entered: 10/05/2020 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Henry Gabathuler on behalf of Appellee(s) Nourison Industries, Inc., Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Walmart Inc.. [20-2910] (HAG) [Entered: 10/05/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jaison Cianelli advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-2910] (CBS) [Entered: 10/05/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jaison Cianelli. [20-2910] (CBS) [Entered: 10/05/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Craig Sanders on behalf of Appellant(s) Jason Cianelli. [20-2910] (CBS) [Entered: 10/05/2020 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 09/22/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jaison Cianelli in District Court No. 3-19-cv-19147. (CJG) [Entered: 09/22/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nourison Industries, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where QVC, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kohls Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant