This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/16/2023 at 11:06:37 (UTC).

Jacquelyn Miller v. Dylan Farris, et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 Jacquelyn Miller filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Dylan Farris,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55764

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant

UNKNOWN

Plaintiff / Appellant

JACQUELYN MILLER

Los Angeles, CA 90034

Defendant / Appellees

DYLAN FARRIS, TUSD Chief Personnel Officer of Human Resources

KEITH BUTLER, TUSD Chief Business Officer of the Business Office

JEREMY GERSON, Vice President of the TUSD Board of Education

JAMES HAN, President of the Board

BETTY LIEU, Member of the Board

ANIL MUHAMMED, Member of the Board

JAMES PARK, Clerk of the Board

TIMOTHY STOWE, Superintendent of TUSD

TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jacquelyn Miller

3751 Motor Ave., Unit 1103

Los Angeles, CA 90034

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Spencer E. Covert Jr.

Attorney at Parker and Covert, LLP

17862 E 17Th Street, Suite 204

Tustin, CA 92780-2164

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Butler, Dylan Farris, Jeremy Gerson, James Han, Betty Lieu, Anil Muhammed, James Park, Timothy Stowe and Torrance Unified School District Unopposed Motion for summary affirmance, Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 08/22/2022. [12522573] [22-55764] (Mott, Jonathan) [Entered: 08/22/2022 12:29 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Jacquelyn Miller response in objection to motion for summary affirmance or dismissal. Served on 08/30/2022. [12532855] (RL) [Entered: 09/02/2022 03:19 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed order (MILAN D. SMITH, JR., DANIEL A. BRESS and LAWRENCE VANDYKE): Appellees motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is granted because the district court orders challenged in the appeal are not final or immediately appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291. Appellees motion for summary affirmance is denied as moot. DISMISSED. [12547851] (AF) [Entered: 09/23/2022 12:09 PM]

#7

(#7) MANDATE ISSUED. (MDS, DAB and LVD) [12564376] (DJV) [Entered: 10/17/2022 07:32 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MANDATE ISSUED. (MDS, DAB and LVD) [12564376] (DJV) [Entered: 10/17/2022 07:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed order (MILAN D. SMITH, JR., DANIEL A. BRESS and LAWRENCE VANDYKE): Appellees motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is granted because the district court orders challenged in the appeal are not final or immediately appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291. Appellees motion for summary affirmance is denied as moot. DISMISSED. [12547851] (AF) [Entered: 09/23/2022 12:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Jonathan Judd Mott, in 22-55764 substituted by Attorney Spencer E. Covert Jr., in 22-55764 [12535085] (BJK) [Entered: 09/07/2022 01:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Spencer E. Covert (Parker & Covert LLP) for Appellees Keith Butler, Dylan Farris, Jeremy Gerson, James Han, Betty Lieu, Anil Muhammed, James Park, Timothy Stowe and Torrance Unified School District. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Jonathan Judd Mott for Appellees Keith Butler, Dylan Farris, Jeremy Gerson, James Han, Betty Lieu, Anil Muhammed, James Park, Timothy Stowe and Torrance Unified School District. Date of service: 09/07/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12534893] [22-55764] (Covert, Spencer) [Entered: 09/07/2022 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Jacquelyn Miller response in objection to motion for summary affirmance or dismissal. Served on 08/30/2022. [12532855] (RL) [Entered: 09/02/2022 03:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Butler, Dylan Farris, Jeremy Gerson, James Han, Betty Lieu, Anil Muhammed, James Park, Timothy Stowe and Torrance Unified School District Unopposed Motion for summary affirmance, Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 08/22/2022. [12522573] [22-55764] (Mott, Jonathan) [Entered: 08/22/2022 12:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jacquelyn Miller opening brief due 10/17/2022. Appellees Keith Butler, Dylan Farris, Jeremy Gerson, James Han, Betty Lieu, Anil Muhammed, James Park, Timothy Stowe and Torrance Unified School District answering brief due 11/17/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12516832] (RT) [Entered: 08/15/2022 11:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spencer E. Covert Jr.