Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 06:26:50 (UTC).

Jacqueline Birchfield v. Deutsche Bank Natl Trust Co, et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Jacqueline Birchfield filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Deutsche Bank Natl Trust Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5491

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DEUTSCHE BANK ACQUISITION TRUST, as Trustee for J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING

PREMIER MORTGAGE FUNDING, INCORPORATED

CHASE BANK USA, N.A.

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, as Trustee for J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust

CHASE BANK ACQUISITION TRUST

Plaintiff / Appellant

JACQUELINE BIRCHFIELD

Elizabethton, TN 37643

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert R. Carl II

Attorney at Baker Donelson

265 Brookview Centre Way, Suite 600

Knoxville, TN 37919

John Thompson Baxter

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough

150 Fourth Avenue, N., Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37219

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jacqueline Birchfield

P.O. Box 204

Elizabethton, TN 37643

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Thompson Baxter for Appellees Chase Bank Acquisition Trust and Chase Bank USA, N.A. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2020. [20-5491] (JTB) [Entered: 07/10/2020 09:50 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Chase Bank Acquisition Trust and Chase Bank USA, N.A. by John T. Baxter. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2020. [20-5491] (JTB) [Entered: 07/10/2020 09:49 AM]

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert R. Carl, II for Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Select Portfolio Servicing Certificate of Service: 07/09/2020. [20-5491] (RRC) [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:45 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company by Robert R. Carl. Certificate of Service: 07/09/2020. [20-5491] (RRC) [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:43 PM]

#5

(#5) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Jacqueline Birchfield Certificate of Service:07/01/2020. Argument Request: PRO SE (RGF) [Entered: 07/06/2020 03:27 PM]

4 #2

miscellaneous letter sent

4 #1

Letter

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/24/2020;. appellee brief due 07/27/2020;. (RGF) [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:21 AM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Jacqueline Birchfield. Transcript needed: n. (RGF) [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:19 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Thompson Baxter for Appellees Chase Bank Acquisition Trust and Chase Bank USA, N.A. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2020. [20-5491] (JTB) [Entered: 07/10/2020 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Chase Bank Acquisition Trust and Chase Bank USA, N.A. by John T. Baxter. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2020. [20-5491] (JTB) [Entered: 07/10/2020 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert R. Carl, II for Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Select Portfolio Servicing Certificate of Service: 07/09/2020. [20-5491] (RRC) [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company by Robert R. Carl. Certificate of Service: 07/09/2020. [20-5491] (RRC) [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Jacqueline Birchfield Certificate of Service:07/01/2020. Argument Request: PRO SE (RGF) [Entered: 07/06/2020 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter sent to all parties regarding the amended caption. (RGF) [Entered: 06/10/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/24/2020;. appellee brief due 07/27/2020;. (RGF) [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Jacqueline Birchfield. Transcript needed: n. (RGF) [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREMIER MORTGAGE FUNDING INC NOM is a litigant

Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corporation is a litigant