Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 06:07:42 (UTC).

Jackson Muni Airport v. Harkins

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Jackson Muni Airport filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Harkins. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-60312

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondents

Alex Monsour

Mark Baker

Nickey Browning

John A. Polk

Phillip Moran

Chris Caughman

Josh Harkins

Dean Kirby

Intervenor / Appellees

Board of Commissioners of the Jackson Municipal Airport Authority, each in his or her official capacity as a Commissioner on the Board of Commissioners of the Jackson Municipal Airport Authority

Reverend James L. Henley, Jr., in his official capacity as a Commissioner on the Board of Commissioners of the Jackson Municipal Airport Authority

LaWanda D. Harris, in her official capacity as a Commissioner on the Board of Commissioners of the Jackson Municipal Airport Authority

Vernon W. Hartley, Sr., individually as citizens of the City of Jackson, Mississippi, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

James L. Henley, Jr., individually as citizens of the City of Jackson, Mississippi, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Doctor Rosie L. T. Pridgen, individually as citizens of the City of Jackson, Mississippi, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Doctor Rosie L. T. Pridgen, in her official capacity as a Commissioner on the Board of Commissioners of the Jackson Municipal Airport Authority

LaWanda D. Harris, individually as citizens of the City of Jackson, Mississippi, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Vernon W. Hartley, Sr., in his official capacity as a Commissioner on the Board of Commissioners of the Jackson Municipal Airport Authority

Evelyn O. Reed, individually as citizens of the City of Jackson, Mississippi, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Jackson Municipal Airport Authority

Evelyn O. Reed, in her official capacity as a Commissioner on the Board of Commissioners of the Jackson Municipal Airport Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Michael Brunson Wallace Esq.

Attorney at Wise Carter Child & Caraway, P.A.

401 E. Capitol Street, Heritage Building

Jackson, MS 39201-2688

Charles Edward Cowan

Attorney at Wise Carter Child & Caraway, P.A.

401 E. Capitol Street, Heritage Building

Jackson, MS 39201-2688

Intervenor / Appellee Attorneys

John L. Walker Esq.

Attorney at Walker Group, P.C.

P.O. Box 22489

Jackson, MS 39225

Fred L. Banks Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, L.L.P.

4270 I-55, N.

Jackson, MS 39211-6391

LaToya Cheree Merritt

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, L.L.P.

4270 I-55, N.

Jackson, MS 39211-6391

Tylvester O. Goss

Attorney at Goss & Williams, P.L.L.C.

1441 Lakeover Road

Jackson, MS 39213

Scott P. Lewis

Attorney at Anderson & Kreiger, L.L.P.

50 Milk Street

Boston, MA 02109

Austin Paganelli Anderson

Attorney at Anderson & Kreiger, L.L.P.

50 Milk Street

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Mr. Mark Baker, Mr. Josh Harkins, Mr. Dean Kirby, Mr. Phillip Moran, Mr. Chris Caughman, Mr. Nickey Browning, Mr. John A. Polk and Mr. Alex Monsour [ # 9585106-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 06/21/2021 for Appellants Mark Baker, Nickey Browning, Chris Caughman, Josh Harkins, Dean Kirby, Alex Monsour, Phillip Moran and John A. Polk [21-60312] (CB) [Entered: 06/01/2021 02:07 PM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Mark Baker, Mr. Nickey Browning, Mr. Chris Caughman, Mr. Josh Harkins, Mr. Dean Kirby, Mr. Alex Monsour, Mr. Phillip Moran and Mr. John A. Polk to extend time to file brief as appellant until 06/21/2021 [9585106-2]. Date of service: 05/28/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Anderson, Banks, Goss, Lewis, Merritt, Walker; Attorney for Appellants: Cowan, Wallace [21-60312] (Charles Edward Cowan ) [Entered: 05/28/2021 02:34 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-60312] (Scott P. Lewis ) [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:05 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60312] (Austin Paganelli Anderson ) [Entered: 05/03/2021 08:55 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. John L. Walker, Esq. for Board of Commissioners of the Jackson Municipal Airport Authority, Ms. LaWanda D. Harris, Mr. Vernon W. Hartley, Sr., Mr. James L. Henley, Jr., Jackson Municipal Airport Authority, Ms. Rosie L. T. Pridgen and Ms. Evelyn O. Reed for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-60312] (John L. Walker ) [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:33 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-60312] (Charles Edward Cowan ) [Entered: 04/23/2021 04:40 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. Mark Baker, Mr. Nickey Browning, Mr. Chris Caughman, Mr. Josh Harkins, Mr. Dean Kirby, Mr. Alex Monsour, Mr. Phillip Moran and Mr. John A. Polkfor the Court to process. Date of service: 04/23/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Banks, Goss, Walker; Attorney for Appellant: Wallace. [21-60312] (Michael Brunson Wallace ) [Entered: 04/23/2021 10:40 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60312] (Michael Brunson Wallace ) [Entered: 04/23/2021 10:31 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9557171-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-60312] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:25 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Mark Baker, Mr. Nickey Browning, Mr. Chris Caughman, Mr. Josh Harkins, Mr. Dean Kirby, Mr. Alex Monsour, Mr. Phillip Moran and Mr. John A. Polk [21-60312] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/14/2021 03:11 PM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Mr. Mark Baker, Mr. Josh Harkins, Mr. Dean Kirby, Mr. Phillip Moran, Mr. Chris Caughman, Mr. Nickey Browning, Mr. John A. Polk and Mr. Alex Monsour [ # 9585106-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 06/21/2021 for Appellants Mark Baker, Nickey Browning, Chris Caughman, Josh Harkins, Dean Kirby, Alex Monsour, Phillip Moran and John A. Polk [21-60312] (CB) [Entered: 06/01/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Mark Baker, Mr. Nickey Browning, Mr. Chris Caughman, Mr. Josh Harkins, Mr. Dean Kirby, Mr. Alex Monsour, Mr. Phillip Moran and Mr. John A. Polk to extend time to file brief as appellant until 06/21/2021 [9585106-2]. Date of service: 05/28/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Anderson, Banks, Goss, Lewis, Merritt, Walker; Attorney for Appellants: Cowan, Wallace [21-60312] (Charles Edward Cowan ) [Entered: 05/28/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John L. Walker for Appellee Jackson Municipal Airport Authority in 21-60312 [21-60312] (MCS) [Entered: 05/13/2021 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Scott P. Lewis for party(s) Appellee LaWanda D. Harris Appellee Vernon W. Hartley Sr. Appellee Rosie L. T. Pridgen Appellee Evelyn O. Reed, in case 21-60312 [21-60312] (MCS) [Entered: 05/06/2021 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Austin Paganelli Anderson for party(s) Appellee LaWanda D. Harris Appellee Vernon W. Hartley Sr. Appellee Rosie L. T. Pridgen Appellee Evelyn O. Reed, in case 21-60312 [21-60312] (MCS) [Entered: 05/06/2021 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Fred L. Banks Jr. for Appellee Evelyn O. Reed in 21-60312, Attorney Fred L. Banks Jr. for Appellee Vernon W. Hartley Sr. in 21-60312, Attorney Fred L. Banks Jr. for Appellee LaWanda D. Harris in 21-60312, Attorney Fred L. Banks Jr. for Appellee James L. Henley Jr. in 21-60312, Attorney Fred L. Banks Jr. for Appellee Rosie L. T. Pridgen in 21-60312, Attorney Fred L. Banks Jr. for Appellee Board of Commissioners of the Jackson Municipal Airport Authority in 21-60312, Attorney Fred L. Banks Jr. for Appellee Jackson Municipal Airport Authority in 21-60312 [21-60312] (MCS) [Entered: 05/06/2021 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) LaToya Cheree Merritt for party(s) Appellee LaWanda D. Harris Appellee Vernon W. Hartley Sr. Appellee Jackson Municipal Airport Authority Appellee James L. Henley Jr. Appellee Board of Commissioners of the Jackson Municipal Airport Authority Appellee Rosie L. T. Pridgen Appellee Evelyn O. Reed, in case 21-60312 [21-60312] (MCS) [Entered: 05/06/2021 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-60312] (Scott P. Lewis ) [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60312] (Austin Paganelli Anderson ) [Entered: 05/03/2021 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. John L. Walker, Esq. for Board of Commissioners of the Jackson Municipal Airport Authority, Ms. LaWanda D. Harris, Mr. Vernon W. Hartley, Sr., Mr. James L. Henley, Jr., Jackson Municipal Airport Authority, Ms. Rosie L. T. Pridgen and Ms. Evelyn O. Reed for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-60312] (John L. Walker ) [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-60312] (CMB) [Entered: 04/27/2021 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Charles Edward Cowan for party(s) Appellant John A. Polk Appellant Mark Baker Appellant Chris Caughman Appellant Josh Harkins Appellant Dean Kirby Appellant Phillip Moran Appellant Nickey Browning Appellant Alex Monsour, in case 21-60312 [21-60312] (MCS) [Entered: 04/26/2021 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-60312] (Charles Edward Cowan ) [Entered: 04/23/2021 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael Brunson Wallace for Appellant Alex Monsour in 21-60312, Attorney Michael Brunson Wallace for Appellant Mark Baker in 21-60312, Attorney Michael Brunson Wallace for Appellant John A. Polk in 21-60312, Attorney Michael Brunson Wallace for Appellant Nickey Browning in 21-60312, Attorney Michael Brunson Wallace for Appellant Chris Caughman in 21-60312, Attorney Michael Brunson Wallace for Appellant Phillip Moran in 21-60312, Attorney Michael Brunson Wallace for Appellant Dean Kirby in 21-60312, Attorney Michael Brunson Wallace for Appellant Josh Harkins in 21-60312 [21-60312] (MCS) [Entered: 04/23/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes (No Hearings). [21-60312] (MCS) [Entered: 04/23/2021 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. Mark Baker, Mr. Nickey Browning, Mr. Chris Caughman, Mr. Josh Harkins, Mr. Dean Kirby, Mr. Alex Monsour, Mr. Phillip Moran and Mr. John A. Polkfor the Court to process. Date of service: 04/23/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Banks, Goss, Walker; Attorney for Appellant: Wallace. [21-60312] (Michael Brunson Wallace ) [Entered: 04/23/2021 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60312] (Michael Brunson Wallace ) [Entered: 04/23/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:16-CV-246. Electronic ROA due on 05/07/2021. [21-60312] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9557171-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-60312] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Mark Baker, Mr. Nickey Browning, Mr. Chris Caughman, Mr. Josh Harkins, Mr. Dean Kirby, Mr. Alex Monsour, Mr. Phillip Moran and Mr. John A. Polk [21-60312] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/14/2021 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael B. Wallace