Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2019 at 06:08:39 (UTC).

Jackie Roller v. James Mills, et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 Jackie Roller filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against James Mills. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-13091

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

BRAXTON COTTON

GEORGIA BOARD OF PARDONS & PAROLES

TERRY BARNARD

JAMES W. MILLS

JACQUELINE BUNN

BRIAN OWENS

PAMELA BALLINGER

Petitioner / Appellant

JACKIE RAY ROLLER

Rock Springs, GA 30739

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Michael Carr

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Sq

Atlanta, GA 30334

Kimberly Daniel

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Sq

Atlanta, GA 30334

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Jackie Ray Roller

Attorney at Walker SP - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 98

Rock Springs, GA 30739

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Amended Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 8858455-2 ] filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. [Entered: 09/24/2019 04:34 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 09/13/2019 as to Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:03 PM]

Open Document

Notice of filing: Letter from appellant stating that fee has been paid to USDC as to Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:01 PM]

Open Document #2

Motion to proceed IFP

Open Document #1

MOT-9 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Jackie Ray Roller was filed on 08/29/2019. Docket Entry 29. [Entered: 09/11/2019 01:56 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly Daniel for Appellees Pamela Ballinger, Terry Barnard, Jacqueline Bunn, Braxton Cotton, Georgia Board of Pardons & Paroles, James W. Mills and Brian Owens. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13091] (ECF: Kimberly Daniel) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:40 PM]

Open Document

Notice of filing: Statement by appellant that he doesn't have to pay fees as to Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:07 AM]

Open Document

Document filed by Jackie Ray Roller in support of Motion filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller in 19-13091 [ # 8866024-2 ]. [Entered: 09/03/2019 10:33 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jackie Ray Roller. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/27/2019 08:01 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for Permission to file a habeas appeal filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8866024-1] [Entered: 08/29/2019 08:26 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. [Entered: 08/29/2019 08:21 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly L. Daniel for Terry Barnard, Jacqueline Bunn, Braxton Cotton, Georgia Board of Pardons and Paroles, James W. Mills, Brian Owens, and Pamela Ballinger [19-13091] (ECF: Kimberly Daniel) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:08 AM]

Open Document

AMENDED MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8858455-1] [Entered: 08/21/2019 08:58 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8853727-1] [Entered: 08/15/2019 10:08 AM]

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Jackie Ray Roller was filed on 07/29/2019. Docket Entry 23. [Entered: 08/15/2019 10:07 AM]

Open Document #4

District Court Order, DE # 23

Open Document #3

District Court Report and Recommendations, DE # 19

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 8858455-2 ] filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. [Entered: 09/24/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 09/13/2019 as to Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of filing: Letter from appellant stating that fee has been paid to USDC as to Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8876993-1] [Entered: 09/11/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Jackie Ray Roller was filed on 08/29/2019. Docket Entry 29. [Entered: 09/11/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly Daniel for Appellees Pamela Ballinger, Terry Barnard, Jacqueline Bunn, Braxton Cotton, Georgia Board of Pardons & Paroles, James W. Mills and Brian Owens. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13091] (ECF: Kimberly Daniel) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of filing: Statement by appellant that he doesn't have to pay fees as to Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Document filed by Jackie Ray Roller in support of Motion filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller in 19-13091 [ # 8866024-2 ]. [Entered: 09/03/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jackie Ray Roller. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/27/2019 08:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for Permission to file a habeas appeal filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8866024-1] [Entered: 08/29/2019 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. [Entered: 08/29/2019 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly L. Daniel for Terry Barnard, Jacqueline Bunn, Braxton Cotton, Georgia Board of Pardons and Paroles, James W. Mills, Brian Owens, and Pamela Ballinger [19-13091] (ECF: Kimberly Daniel) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8858455-1] [Entered: 08/21/2019 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8853727-1] [Entered: 08/15/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Jackie Ray Roller was filed on 07/29/2019. Docket Entry 23. [Entered: 08/15/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jackie Ray Roller on 08/09/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 08/15/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less