This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2019 at 06:08:53 (UTC).

Jacked Up, L.L.C. v. Sara Lee Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Jacked Up, L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sara Lee Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10391

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JACKED UP, L.L.C.

Defendant / Appellee

SARA LEE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Victor Calvin Johnson

Attorney at Dykema Gossett, P.L.L.C.

1717 Main Street, Comerica Bank Tower

Dallas, TX 75201

Melanie Lynn Fry

Attorney at Dykema Cox Smith

112 E. Pecan Street, Weston Centre

San Antonio, TX 78205

Christopher D. Kratovil Esq.

Attorney at Dykema Gossett, P.L.L.C.

1717 Main Street, Comerica Bank Tower

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Paige Lynn

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Cox & Hurst, L.L.P.

2100 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Andres Correa

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Cox & Hurst, L.L.P.

2100 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Christopher John Schwegmann

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Cox & Hurst, L.L.P.

2100 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

David Steven Coale Esq.

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Cox & Hurst, L.L.P.

2100 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:11 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (Christopher John Schwegmann ) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:16 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10391] (Christopher D. Kratovil ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:34 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (Melanie Lynn Fry ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:52 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Jacked Up, L.L.C. [19-10391] (LLL) [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:42 AM]

Open Document

Attorney Christopher J. Schwegmann is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [19-10391] (LBM) [Entered: 05/30/2019 04:19 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Andres Correa is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [19-10391] (LBM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 08:21 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Victor Calvin Johnson for Jacked Up, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (Victor Calvin Johnson ) [Entered: 04/19/2019 04:32 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:12 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (Andres Correa ) [Entered: 06/03/2019 09:58 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10391] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:10 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: OK to Process with Special Issues to be Briefed. [9030406-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10391] (LLL) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:41 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-10391] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Jacked Up, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 04/19/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Johnson; Attorney for Appellee: Lynn [19-10391] (Victor Calvin Johnson ) [Entered: 04/19/2019 06:09 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Andres Correa for party(s) Appellee Sara Lee Corporation, in case 19-10391 [19-10391] (CMB) [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (Andres Correa ) [Entered: 06/03/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christopher John Schwegmann for party(s) Appellee Sara Lee Corporation, in case 19-10391 [19-10391] (CMB) [Entered: 06/03/2019 08:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (Christopher John Schwegmann ) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David Steven Coale for party(s) Appellee Sara Lee Corporation, in case 19-10391 [19-10391] (CB) [Entered: 05/31/2019 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Andres Correa is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [19-10391] (LBM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Christopher J. Schwegmann is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [19-10391] (LBM) [Entered: 05/30/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10391] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Melanie Lynn Fry for party(s) Appellant Jacked Up, L.L.C., in case 19-10391 [19-10391] (CMB) [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christopher D. Kratovil for party(s) Appellant Jacked Up, L.L.C., in case 19-10391 [19-10391] (CMB) [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (Melanie Lynn Fry ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Victor Calvin Johnson for Appellant Jacked Up, L.L.C. in 19-10391 [19-10391] (CMB) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10391] (Christopher D. Kratovil ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-10391] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Jacked Up, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 04/19/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Johnson; Attorney for Appellee: Lynn [19-10391] (Victor Calvin Johnson ) [Entered: 04/19/2019 06:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Victor Calvin Johnson for Jacked Up, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10391] (Victor Calvin Johnson ) [Entered: 04/19/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:11-CV-3296. Electronic ROA due on 05/01/2019. [19-10391] (LLL) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: OK to Process with Special Issues to be Briefed. [9030406-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10391] (LLL) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Jacked Up, L.L.C. [19-10391] (LLL) [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.