This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/01/2022 at 06:17:03 (UTC).

Jack Spence v. USA

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Jack Spence filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3044

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

JACK SPENCE

Terre Haute, IN 47808-0000

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Jack Spence

Attorney at UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY

P.O. Box 33

Terre Haute, IN 47808-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Kristina Korobov

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

Ten W. Market Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-3048

 

Court Documents

#1

2255/Appealability Denied Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) ORDER: Petitioner-appellant Jack Spence shall file, on or before November 17, 2021, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be STAYED pending the entry of the order disposing of the motion. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). [7196772] DW. [2] [7196772] [21-3044] (HTP) [Entered: 11/03/2021 02:11 PM]

3 #1

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

3 #2

C.R. 3(b) Fee Notice

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Jack Spence Memorandum. [4] [7200106] [21-3044] (MAN) [Entered: 11/18/2021 01:50 PM]

5 #1

3(c) Rule to Showcause Order

5 #2

Instructions

#6

(#6) ORDER: Filed clerk's notice to Appellee USA to file a response to PAPER, filed by appellant on 11/18/21. Response due for Appellee United States of America by 11/29/2021, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the court's order of 11/3/21. DW [6] [7200861] [21-3044] (ER) [Entered: 11/22/2021 04:01 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed Response by Appellee USA Attorney Kristina M. Korobov to court order of 11/22/2021. [7][7201482] [21-3044] (Korobov, Kristina) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:18 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER: On consideration of the Governments Response to Court Order filed by appellee on November 24, 2021, in which appellee reports that the district court denied appellants Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment on November 12, 2021, this appeal shall proceed to a determination of appellants fee status on appeal, and to a determination whether a certificate of appealability should issue. Briefing remains SUSPENDED pending further court order. DW [7202049] [21-3044] (FP) [Entered: 11/29/2021 05:05 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jack Spence. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [9] [7202926] [21-3044] (CAG) [Entered: 12/02/2021 01:39 PM]

#10

RESTRICTED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Prose motion filed by Appellant Jack Spence to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [10] [7202927] [21-3044] (CAG) [Entered: 12/02/2021 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jack Spence. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [9] [7202926] [21-3044] (CAG) [Entered: 12/02/2021 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: On consideration of the Governments Response to Court Order filed by appellee on November 24, 2021, in which appellee reports that the district court denied appellants Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment on November 12, 2021, this appeal shall proceed to a determination of appellants fee status on appeal, and to a determination whether a certificate of appealability should issue. Briefing remains SUSPENDED pending further court order. DW [7202049] [21-3044] (FP) [Entered: 11/29/2021 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Response by Appellee USA Attorney Kristina M. Korobov to court order of 11/22/2021. [7][7201482] [21-3044] (Korobov, Kristina) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Filed clerk's notice to Appellee USA to file a response to PAPER, filed by appellant on 11/18/21. Response due for Appellee United States of America by 11/29/2021, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the court's order of 11/3/21. DW [6] [7200861] [21-3044] (ER) [Entered: 11/22/2021 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Appellant Jack Spence is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Jack Spence by 12/03/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7020 2450 0001 4762 3610. [5] [7200236] [21-3044] (AD) [Entered: 11/19/2021 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Jack Spence Memorandum. [4] [7200106] [21-3044] (MAN) [Entered: 11/18/2021 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Jack Spence leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. (See order for further details). Date IFP denied: 11/12/2021. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 12/15/2021 for Appellant Jack Spence. [7199180] [3] [7199180] [21-3044] (MM) [Entered: 11/15/2021 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: Petitioner-appellant Jack Spence shall file, on or before November 17, 2021, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be STAYED pending the entry of the order disposing of the motion. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). [7196772] DW. [2] [7196772] [21-3044] (HTP) [Entered: 11/03/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Federal prisoner's 2255 case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 08/30/2021. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jack Spence by 11/05/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 11/16/2021. [1] [7196633] [21-3044] (MM) [Entered: 11/03/2021 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristina M. Korobov