This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:01:21 (UTC).

Jack Jordan v. DOL

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Jack Jordan filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against DOL. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5201

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jack Jordan

Parkville, MO 64152

Defendant / Appellee

United States Department of Labor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jack Jordan

6225 Northlake Drive

Parkville, MO 64152

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Jason Todd Cohen Esquire

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1797510] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-01868-RC filed by Jack Jordan. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5201. [19-5201] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1797512] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/30/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/30/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. [19-5201] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:55 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1797787] to supplement record filed by Jack Jordan (Service Date: 07/17/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 4,768 words. [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:44 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1801704] filed by Jack Jordan on behalf of Appellant Jack Jordan. [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:15 PM]

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Transcript Status Report

Open Document #2

Supporting Opinion 7-1-2019

Open Document #1

Underlying Decision in Case Filed

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1801738] filed by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:06 PM]

Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER [1805520] filed granting motions to extend time. Appellees dispositive motion and response to the motion for summary reversal is now due on October 29, 2019. Before Judges: Rogers, Tatel and Srinivasan. [19-5201] [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:49 AM]

Open Document #1

Response to Motion Filed

Open Document #2

Ex 1 Emails with DOJ re Powers' email 8/27/2019

Open Document

MOTION [1803802] to extend time to file response to 10/29/2019 filed by DOL (Service Date: 08/27/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 396 Words. [19-5201] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 08/27/2019 10:30 AM]

Open Document #5

ECF 60 Opinion 3/30/2018

Open Document #4

ECF 39 Opinion 8/4/2017

Open Document #1

Motion Filed

Open Document #3

ECF 72 Opinion re Denial of Relief under FRCP 60

Open Document #2

ECF 71 Order Denying Relief under FRCP 60

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM ORDER [1805520] filed granting motions to extend time. Appellees dispositive motion and response to the motion for summary reversal is now due on October 29, 2019. Before Judges: Rogers, Tatel and Srinivasan. [19-5201] [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1803941] to motion to extend time [ # 1803802-2 ] filed by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 08/27/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,860 words. [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/27/2019 11:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1803802] to extend time to file response to 10/29/2019 filed by DOL (Service Date: 08/27/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 396 Words. [19-5201] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 08/27/2019 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1803715] for summary reversal (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/05/2019) filed by Jack Jordan (Service Date: 08/26/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,200 words. [19-5201]--[Edited 08/27/2019 by AY] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1803529] to motion to extend time [ # 1803452-2 ] filed by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 08/23/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,020 words. [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1803452] to extend time to file motion to 10/29/2019 filed by DOL (Service Date: 08/23/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 308 Words. [19-5201] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY [1802257] filed by Jack Jordan to response [ # 1802221-2 ] [Service Date: 08/14/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,973 words. [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/14/2019 08:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1802221] to motion [ # 1797787-2 ] filed by DOL [Service Date: 08/14/2019 by US Mail] Length Certification: 843 Words. [19-5201] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 08/14/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1802219] filed by DOL [Service Date: 08/14/2019 ] [19-5201] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 08/14/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1802218] filed by Jason T. Cohen and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee DOL. [19-5201] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 08/14/2019 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1801782] issue a ruling on Appellant's unopposed motion filed 7/17/2019 filed by Jack Jordan (Service Date: 08/12/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,305 words. [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/12/2019 09:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1801739] filed by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1801738] filed by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1801710] submitted by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ] [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1801708] filed by Jack Jordan [Service Date: 08/12/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1801704] filed by Jack Jordan on behalf of Appellant Jack Jordan. [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1797787] to supplement record filed by Jack Jordan (Service Date: 07/17/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 4,768 words. [19-5201] (Jordan, Jack) [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1797512] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/30/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/30/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. [19-5201] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1797510] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-01868-RC filed by Jack Jordan. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5201. [19-5201] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5201] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.