This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2019 at 06:09:11 (UTC).

Jace Cole v. Dragonfly Aviation, L.L.C., et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Jace Cole filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Dragonfly Aviation, L L C . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-30268

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CATHY E. REED, also known as Cathy Walker Reed, also known as Cathy Walker

KEVIN J. REED

DRAGONFLY AVIATION, L.L.C.

Plaintiff / Appellant

JACE TANNER COLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jude Christopher Bursavich Esq.

Attorney at Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, L.L.P.

301 Main Street, 1 American Place

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Danielle Lauren Borel

Attorney at Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, L.L.P.

301 Main Street, 1 American Place

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tony B. Jobe Esq.

Attorney at Law Offices of Tony B. Jobe

1144 Hardy Drive

Covington, LA 70443

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Dispositive Court Order

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30268] (Danielle Lauren Borel ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:42 AM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Jace Tanner Cole [19-30268] (CCR) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:20 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Tony B. Jobe, Esq. for Mr. Jace Tanner Cole for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30268] (Tony B. Jobe ) [Entered: 04/15/2019 07:06 PM]

Open Document #2

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. SPECIAL ISSUES TO BE BRIEFED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/28/2019 for Appellant Jace Tanner Cole. [19-30268] (RLL) [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:22 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Jace Tanner Cole advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-30268] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Jace Tanner Cole advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 04/15/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Bursavich; Attorney for Appellant: Jobe [19-30268] (Tony B. Jobe ) [Entered: 04/15/2019 07:12 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30268] (Jude Christopher Bursavich ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:48 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: OK to Process with Special Issues to be Briefed. [9029500-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30268] (CCR) [Entered: 04/15/2019 01:24 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION to dismiss appeal without prejudice [9046735-2]. Date of service: 05/07/2019 [19-30268] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Jace Tanner Cole to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9046735-2]. Date of service: 05/07/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Borel, Bursavich; Attorney for Appellant: Jobe [19-30268] (Tony B. Jobe ) [Entered: 05/07/2019 11:08 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT ORDER granting Motion to dismiss appeal without prejudice filed by Appellant Mr. Jace Tanner Cole [ # 9046735-2 ]. [19-30268] (MAS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION to dismiss appeal without prejudice [9046735-2]. Date of service: 05/07/2019 [19-30268] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Jace Tanner Cole to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9046735-2]. Date of service: 05/07/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Borel, Bursavich; Attorney for Appellant: Jobe [19-30268] (Tony B. Jobe ) [Entered: 05/07/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. SPECIAL ISSUES TO BE BRIEFED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/28/2019 for Appellant Jace Tanner Cole. [19-30268] (RLL) [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30268] (RLL) [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Danielle Lauren Borel for Appellee Cathy E. Reed, Appellee Kevin J. Reed, Appellee Dragonfly Aviation, L.L.C. in case 19-30268 [19-30268] (AGL) [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jude Christopher Bursavich for Appellee Kevin J. Reed in 19-30268, Attorney Jude Christopher Bursavich for Appellee Cathy E. Reed in 19-30268, Attorney Jude Christopher Bursavich for Appellee Dragonfly Aviation, L.L.C. in 19-30268 [19-30268] (AGL) [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Tony B. Jobe for Appellant Jace Tanner Cole in 19-30268 [19-30268] (MAS) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30268] (Jude Christopher Bursavich ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30268] (Danielle Lauren Borel ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Jace Tanner Cole advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-30268] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Jace Tanner Cole advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 04/15/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Bursavich; Attorney for Appellant: Jobe [19-30268] (Tony B. Jobe ) [Entered: 04/15/2019 07:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Tony B. Jobe, Esq. for Mr. Jace Tanner Cole for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30268] (Tony B. Jobe ) [Entered: 04/15/2019 07:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-367. Electronic ROA due on 04/30/2019. [19-30268] (CCR) [Entered: 04/15/2019 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: OK to Process with Special Issues to be Briefed. [9029500-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30268] (CCR) [Entered: 04/15/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Jace Tanner Cole [19-30268] (CCR) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.