This case was last updated from PACER on 03/31/2020 at 06:01:41 (UTC).

J & W Trading & Leasing, Inc. v. Beth Van Doren

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 J W Trading Leasing, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Beth Van Doren. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-444

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Peter F. Mhina, President, J & W Investor

E.E.M., Minor Child, Second V.P. and J & W Investor

Kathy M. Mhina, Treasurer and J & W Investor

Defendants

Citizens Bank

Keybank N.A.

Citizens Bank Vice President of Security, AKA John Cruse

County of Onondaga

Woodhaven Apartments Superintendent, AKA John

State of New York

Owner of Woodhaven Apartments

City of Syracuse

Vinod Luthra, the C.E.O., President and Owner of Woodhaven Apartments

Cathleen Nash, C.E.O. and President of Citizen's Bank

Henry L. Meyer, III, C.E.O. of Key Bank

Amy Bidwell, Bank of America Branch Manager

Woodhaven Apartments, sued in its capacity as a legal entity

John Doe 5, Bank of America Branch Manager

Beth Van Doren, Assistant District Attorney for Onondaga County

Defendant / Appellee

Anthony Colavita, City of Syracuse Police Detective

Plaintiff / Appellant

James P. Mhina, C.E.O. of J & W Trading & Leasing, Inc.

P.O. Box 133

Syracuse, NY 13201

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christina F. DeJoseph

Attorney at Corporation Counsel for the City of Syracuse

233 E. Washington Street, 300 City Hall

Syracuse, NY 13202

Todd Michael Long Esq.

Attorney at Office of the Corporation Counsel, City of Syracuse

300 City Hall, 233 East Washington Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

Sarah Mae Knickerbocker Esq.

Attorney at City of Syracuse Office of the Corporation Counsel

233 East Washington Street, 300 City Hall

Syracuse, NY 13202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

James P. Mhina

P.O. Box 133

Syracuse, NY 13201

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Oral Argument Statement LR 34.1 (a), [25], on behalf of Appellant James P. Mhina, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2798075] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:56 PM]

#28

(#28) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [22], on behalf of Appellant James P. Mhina, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2798042] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:30 PM]

#27

(#27) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for permission to file Appellant's 85 page handwritten Brief, [21], on behalf of Appellant James P. Mhina, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2798007] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:00 PM]

#26

(#26) PAPERS, copies of the default order, mailing wrappers, public docket sheet, pro se scheduling notification, Form D-P, Addendum A to the Acknolwedgment and Notice of Appearance, RECEIVED.[2797904] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 12:08 PM]

#19

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#14

(#15) ATTORNEY, Tood M. Long, [ # 14 ], in place of attorney Christina F. Joseph, SUBSTITUTED.[2790093] [20-444] [Entered: 02/28/2020 04:28 PM]

#13

(#13) NOTICE, to Appellees David Buske and Anthony Colavita, for failure to file an appearance, copy to pro se appellant, SENT.[2781962] [20-444] [Entered: 02/19/2020 04:28 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER, dated 02/19/2020, dismissing appeal by 03/11/2020, unless Appellant James P. Mhina, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2781952] [20-444] [Entered: 02/19/2020 04:24 PM]

#7

(#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2769633] [20-444] [Entered: 02/04/2020 02:47 PM]

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/15/2020, RECEIVED.[2769600] [20-444] [Entered: 02/04/2020 02:36 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Oral Argument Statement LR 34.1 (a), [25], on behalf of Appellant James P. Mhina, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2798075] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [24], on behalf of Appellant James P. Mhina, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2798070] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [23], on behalf of Appellant James P. Mhina, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2798060] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [22], on behalf of Appellant James P. Mhina, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2798042] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for permission to file Appellant's 85 page handwritten Brief, [21], on behalf of Appellant James P. Mhina, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2798007] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) PAPERS, copies of the default order, mailing wrappers, public docket sheet, pro se scheduling notification, Form D-P, Addendum A to the Acknolwedgment and Notice of Appearance, RECEIVED.[2797904] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#25) ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Appellant James P. Mhina, FILED. Service date 03/03/2020 by US mail. [2797787] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#24) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant James P. Mhina, informing Court of proposed due date 04/10/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 03/03/2020 by US mail.[2797784] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#23) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant James P. Mhina, FILED. Service date 03/03/2020 by US mail.[2797782] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#22) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party James P. Mhina, FILED. Service date 03/03/2020 by US mail.[2797780] [20-444] [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY, Tood M. Long, [ # 14 ], in place of attorney Christina F. Joseph, SUBSTITUTED.[2790093] [20-444] [Entered: 02/28/2020 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee David Buske and Anthony Colavita, FILED. Service date 02/28/2020 by US mail. [2789481] [20-444] [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE, to Appellees David Buske and Anthony Colavita, for failure to file an appearance, copy to pro se appellant, SENT.[2781962] [20-444] [Entered: 02/19/2020 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER, dated 02/19/2020, dismissing appeal by 03/11/2020, unless Appellant James P. Mhina, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2781952] [20-444] [Entered: 02/19/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER, dated 02/19/2020, dismissing appeal by 03/11/2020, unless Appellant James P. Mhina, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2781806] [20-444] [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2769633] [20-444] [Entered: 02/04/2020 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2769628] [20-444] [Entered: 02/04/2020 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/15/2020, RECEIVED.[2769600] [20-444] [Entered: 02/04/2020 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/15/2020, RECEIVED.[2769598] [20-444] [Entered: 02/04/2020 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant James P. Mhina, FILED. [2769594] [20-444] [Entered: 02/04/2020 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHN A. PULEO AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN A PULEO TRUST DATED JULY 28 2020 is a litigant

Latest cases where CITIZENS BANK N A is a litigant