This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:06 (UTC).

J. Parnell v. A. Martinez, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 J Parnell filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against A Martinez. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16393

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

A. WHALEN

J. CURIEL

A. MARTINEZ

V. ESTRELLA

Plaintiff / Appellant

J. P. PARNELL

Vacaville, CA 95696-2000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

J. P. Parnell

Attorney at CMF - CALIFORNIA MEDICAL FACILITY

P.O. Box 2000

Vacaville, CA 95696-2000

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant J. P. Parnell motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief. Deficiencies: None. [11419187] (NAC) [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:24 PM]

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

#4

(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SSR): Appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ] ) to consolidate is denied. No. 19-16193 and No. 19-16393 will proceed separately. Appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ] ) for an extension of time to file the opening brief in No. 19-16393 is granted. The opening brief in No. 19-16393 is due October 15, 2019. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, the excerpts of record requirement is waived. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. Because there are no appearances by appellees, briefing will be complete upon filing of the opening brief. [11427088] (RT) [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:38 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant J. P. Parnell motion for enlargement of time and motion to consolidate. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/07/2019. [11416753] (RL) [Entered: 08/30/2019 12:03 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SSR): Appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ] ) to consolidate is denied. No. 19-16193 and No. 19-16393 will proceed separately. Appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ] ) for an extension of time to file the opening brief in No. 19-16393 is granted. The opening brief in No. 19-16393 is due October 15, 2019. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, the excerpts of record requirement is waived. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. Because there are no appearances by appellees, briefing will be complete upon filing of the opening brief. [11427088] (RT) [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed Appellant J. P. Parnell motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief. Deficiencies: None. [11419187] (NAC) [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed Appellant J. P. Parnell motion for enlargement of time and motion to consolidate. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/07/2019. [11416753] (RL) [Entered: 08/30/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant J. P. Parnell opening brief due 09/13/2019. [11363839] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.