This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/05/2022 at 06:10:47 (UTC).

Isaias Mosqueda-Cisneros, et al v. ICE, et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 Isaias Mosqueda-Cisneros filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ICE. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15692

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant

COUNTY OF YUBA

Plaintiff / Appellants

ISAIAS MOSQUEDA-CISNEROS

ERICA TENERIO

Defendant / Appellees

IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gloria Pauline Martinez-Senftner Esquire

Attorney at Martinez Law Group, PC

1600 Sacramento Inn Way, Suite 116

Sacramento, CA 95815

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Joseph Frueh

Attorney at USSAC - Office of the US Attorney

501 I Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal may not be final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable under 1291 unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with Rule 54(b)). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellants shall either move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellants elect to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellants do not comply with this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12444523] (RT) [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:35 PM]

#3

(#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12452578] (LW) [Entered: 05/20/2022 01:10 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Isaias Mosqueda-Cisneros, Erica Tenerio and Appellee ICE Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/27/2022. [12458947] [22-15692] (Martinez-Senftner, Gloria) [Entered: 05/27/2022 04:51 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: LCC) : On May 11, 2022, this court ordered appellants, within 21 days, either to move for voluntary dismissal of this appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The order warned appellants that failure to comply would result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk of the Court. To date, appellants have not complied with the courts order. Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as and for the mandate of this court. [12472160] (RT) [Entered: 06/15/2022 02:57 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: LCC) : On May 11, 2022, this court ordered appellants, within 21 days, either to move for voluntary dismissal of this appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The order warned appellants that failure to comply would result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk of the Court. To date, appellants have not complied with the courts order. Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as and for the mandate of this court. [12472160] (RT) [Entered: 06/15/2022 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/27/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12458998]. [22-15692] (AD) [Entered: 05/27/2022 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Isaias Mosqueda-Cisneros, Erica Tenerio and Appellee ICE Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/27/2022. [12458947] [22-15692] (Martinez-Senftner, Gloria) [Entered: 05/27/2022 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12452578] (LW) [Entered: 05/20/2022 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal may not be final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable under 1291 unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with Rule 54(b)). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellants shall either move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellants elect to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellants do not comply with this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12444523] (RT) [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Isaias Mosqueda-Cisneros and Erica Tenerio Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/13/2022. Appellants Isaias Mosqueda-Cisneros and Erica Tenerio opening brief due 07/11/2022. Appellees Immigration and Customs Enforcement and United States of America answering brief due 08/11/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12440180] (RT) [Entered: 05/06/2022 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Frueh