This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/21/2022 at 06:06:15 (UTC).

Isaac Rodriguez v. Charles Ryan, et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Isaac Rodriguez filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Charles Ryan,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15085

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ISAAC JUDE RODRIGUEZ

San Luis, AZ 85349

Defendant / Appellees

CHARLES L. RYAN, Director

HACKER-AGNEW, Named as Ms. Hacker, Former Complex Warden at ASPC Yuma

ZARAGOZA, Named as Mr. Zaragoza, Former Deputy Warden at ASPC Yuma

ROMO, Named as Mr. Romo, Former CO 4 at ASPC Yuma

HUDSON, Named as Ms. Hudson, Former Captain DOC Officer

ROSA, Named as Mr. Rosa, Former Lieutenant DOC Officer

JOHN DOE, 1-10, DOC Officers; John Doe 1-10, ADOC Tactical Support Unit Members

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Isaac Jude Rodriguez

Attorney at ASPCY - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX (YUMA)

P.O. Box 8909

San Luis, AZ 85349

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Patrick Joseph Boyle Esquire

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet - Pro Se

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12347060] (CKP) [Entered: 01/21/2022 10:18 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Isaac Jude Rodriguez motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. [12383382] (NAC) [Entered: 03/01/2022 02:19 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Isaac Jude Rodriguez motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [12383386] (NAC) [Entered: 03/01/2022 02:20 PM]

5 #1

Main Document

5 #2

Additional Document

#6

(#6) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 03/11/2022. [12395281] (NAC) [Entered: 03/15/2022 01:54 PM]

7 #1

Main Document

7 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [12396117] (CKP) [Entered: 03/16/2022 10:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 03/11/2022. [12395281] (NAC) [Entered: 03/15/2022 01:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): The district court found appellant financially eligible for appointed counsel and never revoked that status. Appellant, therefore, may proceed in forma pauperis on appeal without further authorization, and his motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 4 ] is unnecessary. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3). On January 21, 2022, this court ordered appellant to complete and file with this court the enclosed prisoner authorization form. To date, appellant has not complied with this order. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall sign and file with this court the enclosed prisoner authorization form. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The Clerk shall send a copy of the January 21, 2022 order to appellant along with this order. The briefing schedule is stayed pending disposition of appellants motion for appointment of counsel, which will be addressed by separate order. [12385608] (CKP) [Entered: 03/03/2022 02:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Isaac Jude Rodriguez motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [12383386] (NAC) [Entered: 03/01/2022 02:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Isaac Jude Rodriguez motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. [12383382] (NAC) [Entered: 03/01/2022 02:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12347060] (CKP) [Entered: 01/21/2022 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 02/17/2022. Transcript due 03/21/2022. Appellant Isaac Jude Rodriguez opening brief due 04/28/2022. Appellees John Doe, Hacker-Agnew, Hudson, Romo, Rosa, Charles L. Ryan and Zaragoza answering brief due 05/31/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12346142] (OC) [Entered: 01/20/2022 01:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick Joseph Boyle Esquire